This case was last updated from Garland County Courts on 05/24/2022 at 02:54:16 (UTC).

RMC OF AMERICA V SCOTT LACY -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 08/05/2021 RMC OF AMERICA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SCOTT LACY -NON-TRIAL. This case was filed in Garland County Courts, Garland County District Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-769

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Garland, Arkansas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RMC OF AMERICA

Defendants

LACY, SCOTT ANTHONY

LACY, SCOTT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIZER, MAXIE GENE

 

Court Documents

CV COMPLAINT FILED $

08/05/2021: CV COMPLAINT FILED $

SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

08/06/2021: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

MOTION EXTEND SERVICE TIME

11/11/2021: MOTION EXTEND SERVICE TIME

ORDER EXTEND SERVICE TIME

11/15/2021: ORDER EXTEND SERVICE TIME

SUMMONS SERVED

12/10/2021: SUMMONS SERVED

JUDGMENT-DEFAULT

12/23/2021: JUDGMENT-DEFAULT

INTERROGATORIES

01/04/2022: INTERROGATORIES

WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED

01/10/2022: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

01/21/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

SUMMONS SERVED

01/21/2022: SUMMONS SERVED

ORDER GARNISHMENT RELEASED

01/31/2022: ORDER GARNISHMENT RELEASED

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER GARNISHMENT RELEASED; Name: DISTRICT JUDGE OF GARLAND COUNTY,; Entry: ORDER TO RELEASE GARNISHMENT SIGNED BY JUDGE GRAHAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS SERVED; Name: KIZER, MAXIE GENE; Entry: PROOF OF SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL TO GARNISHEE FILED BY ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Name: KIZER, MAXIE GENE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $10.00 was made on receipt 26HT193819.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED; Name: KIZER, MAXIE GENE; Entry: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT FILED BY ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: INTERROGATORIES; Name: KIZER, MAXIE GENE; Entry: ALLEGATIONS AND INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: JUDGMENT-DEFAULT; Name: DISTRICT JUDGE OF GARLAND COUNTY,; Entry: DEFAULT JUDGMENT SIGNED BY JUDGE GRAHAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS SERVED; Name: KIZER, MAXIE GENE; Entry: PROOF OF SERVICE BY PROCESS SERVER ON 11/8/21 TO SCOTT LOY FILED BY ATTY KIZER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER EXTEND SERVICE TIME; Name: DISTRICT JUDGE OF GARLAND COUNTY,; Entry: ORDER EXTENDING SERVICE TIME SIGNED BY JUDGE GRAHAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION EXTEND SERVICE TIME; Name: KIZER, MAXIE GENE; Entry: MOTION EXTENSION OF TIME FILED BY ATTY KIZER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $82.50 was made on receipt 26HT184982.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE DISTRICT 16-17-126; Name: KIZER, MAXIE GENE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: CV COMPLAINT FILED $; Name: KIZER, MAXIE GENE; Entry: RMC VS LACY

    Read MoreRead Less