This case was last updated from Pulaski County Courts on 05/11/2022 at 22:49:49 (UTC).

RILEY JEAN ADAMS V BLAKE LEE ADAMS -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 02/05/2021 RILEY JEAN ADAMS filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against BLAKE LEE ADAMS -NON-TRIAL. This case was filed in Pulaski County Courts, Pulaski County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is HON. SHAWN JOHNSON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-408

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Pulaski, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

HON. SHAWN JOHNSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ADAMS, RILEY JEAN

Defendant

ADAMS, BLAKE LEE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

DICKSON, NATALIE J

ROGERS, MARJORIE E

BUZBEE, JOHN B.

 

Court Documents

ORDER INCOME WITHHOLDING

04/29/2022: ORDER INCOME WITHHOLDING

RETURN OF SERVICE

03/25/2022: RETURN OF SERVICE

AGREED ORDER

03/18/2022: AGREED ORDER

NOTICE OF HEARING

03/04/2022: NOTICE OF HEARING

ORDER EX PARTE

03/04/2022: ORDER EX PARTE

RESPONSE/REPLY

03/04/2022: RESPONSE/REPLY

ANSWER FILED

03/04/2022: ANSWER FILED

MOTION OTHER

03/03/2022: MOTION OTHER

ORDER - SCHEDULING ORDER

01/28/2022: ORDER - SCHEDULING ORDER

NOTICE OF HEARING

01/28/2022: NOTICE OF HEARING

MOTION CITATION/CONTEMPT

01/25/2022: MOTION CITATION/CONTEMPT

ANSWER FILED

01/19/2022: ANSWER FILED

MOTION CITATION/CONTEMPT

01/10/2022: MOTION CITATION/CONTEMPT

DECREE OF DIVORCE

01/04/2022: DECREE OF DIVORCE

BRIEF FILED

12/30/2021: BRIEF FILED

WITNESS LIST

12/28/2021: WITNESS LIST

WITNESS LIST

12/28/2021: WITNESS LIST

WITNESS LIST

12/28/2021: WITNESS LIST

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2022
  • HearingEvent: MOTION HEARING; Room: COURTROOM 300, 14TH DIVISION; Location: CIRCUIT; Judge: HON. SHAWN JOHNSON - 14TH DIVISION 6TH CIRCUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER INCOME WITHHOLDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: RETURN OF SERVICE; Entry: 3-23-2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AGREED ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: EVENT CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER EX PARTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: RESPONSE/REPLY; Name: BUZBEE, JOHN B.; Entry: Reply to Answer to Emergency Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER FILED; Name: DICKSON, NATALIE J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION OTHER; Name: BUZBEE, JOHN B.; Entry: Emergency Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS SERVED; Name: DICKSON, NATALIE J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER TRANSPARENTING SEMINAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: STANDING RESTRAINING ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $167.50 was made on receipt 60CI419793.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: DICKSON, NATALIE J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED; Name: DICKSON, NATALIE J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: DICKSON, NATALIE J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION SHEET; Name: DICKSON, NATALIE J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: DICKSON, NATALIE J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET DOMESTIC REL; Name: DICKSON, NATALIE J

    Read MoreRead Less