This case was last updated from Benton County Courts on 04/29/2022 at 03:18:01 (UTC).

RICKY LEE ROBERTSON -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 04/29/2021 RICKY LEE ROBERTSON -NON-TRIAL was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Benton County Courts, Benton County District Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is HORWART. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-437

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Benton, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

HORWART

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LAYNE ROBERTSON, BARBARA

Claimant

FORTE LLC, ALEGIS GROUP

Decedent

ROBERTSON, RICKY LEE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

TEAGUE, ROBERT D

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

04/29/2021: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

ORDER APPOINT PERS REPRESENT

05/04/2021: ORDER APPOINT PERS REPRESENT

LETTERS TESTAMENTARY

05/04/2021: LETTERS TESTAMENTARY

NOTICE APPT ADMINISTRATOR/TRIX

05/06/2021: NOTICE APPT ADMINISTRATOR/TRIX

PETITION

05/13/2021: PETITION

ORDER OTHER

05/18/2021: ORDER OTHER

AFFIDAVIT FILED

05/21/2021: AFFIDAVIT FILED

ACCEPT APPOINTMENT

06/10/2021: ACCEPT APPOINTMENT

AFFIDAVIT CLAIM AGAINST ESTATE

07/12/2021: AFFIDAVIT CLAIM AGAINST ESTATE

NOTICE AFF CLAIM AGAINST ESTAT

07/12/2021: NOTICE AFF CLAIM AGAINST ESTAT

REPORT OF SALE

07/21/2021: REPORT OF SALE

SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED

11/23/2021: SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED

PETITION

11/23/2021: PETITION

ORDER CLOSING ESTATE

11/26/2021: ORDER CLOSING ESTATE

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER; Entry: TRIAL TYPE: N

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER CLOSING ESTATE; Name: 19TH WEST CIRCUIT DIVISION 7,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC DISPOSITION SHEET; Name: TEAGUE, ROBERT D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: PETITION; Name: TEAGUE, ROBERT D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED; Name: TEAGUE, ROBERT D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: REPORT OF SALE; Name: TEAGUE, ROBERT D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of -$5.00 was made on receipt 04CO7590.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE AFF CLAIM AGAINST ESTAT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT CLAIM AGAINST ESTATE; Entry: FORTE LLC, CAPITAL ONE BANK-165.35

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $165.00 was made on receipt 04CO7371.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT FILED; Name: TEAGUE, ROBERT D; Entry: PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER OTHER; Name: 19TH WEST CIRCUIT DIVISION 7,; Entry: APPROVE SALE OF REAL ESTATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: PETITION; Name: TEAGUE, ROBERT D; Entry: APPROVE SALE OF PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE APPT ADMINISTRATOR/TRIX; Name: TEAGUE, ROBERT D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: LETTERS TESTAMENTARY; Name: TEAGUE, ROBERT D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER APPOINT PERS REPRESENT; Name: 19TH WEST CIRCUIT DIVISION 7,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: TEAGUE, ROBERT D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: TEAGUE, ROBERT D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET PROBATE; Name: TEAGUE, ROBERT D

    Read MoreRead Less