This case was last updated from Miller County Courts on 02/28/2023 at 16:41:50 (UTC).

RICHSMITH MANAGEMENT LLC V CAMRY LAFAYETTE -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 09/14/2022 RICHSMITH MANAGEMENT LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against CAMRY LAFAYETTE -NON-TRIAL. This case was filed in Miller County Courts, Miller County Circuit Court located in Nevada, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is JONES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-455

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Miller, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

JONES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RICHSMITH MANAGEMENT, LLC

Defendant

LAFAYETTE, CAMRY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SMITH, SYLVESTER L

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

09/14/2022: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

EXHIBITS

09/14/2022: EXHIBITS

EXHIBITS

09/14/2022: EXHIBITS

AFFIDAVIT FILED

09/14/2022: AFFIDAVIT FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/14/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED

RETURN OF SERVICE

10/11/2022: RETURN OF SERVICE

ORDER OTHER

10/25/2022: ORDER OTHER

WRIT OF POSSESSION$

10/26/2022: WRIT OF POSSESSION$

WRIT SERVED

11/07/2022: WRIT SERVED

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: WRIT SERVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $20.00 was made on receipt 46CI47985.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: WRIT OF POSSESSION$; Name: SMITH, SYLVESTER L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER OTHER; Name: EIGHT SOUTH CIRCUIT DIVISION 1,; Entry: ORDER FOR IMMEDIATE POSSESSION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: RETURN OF SERVICE; Name: SMITH, SYLVESTER L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $167.50 was made on receipt 46CI47528.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: SMITH, SYLVESTER L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: SMITH, SYLVESTER L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED; Name: SMITH, SYLVESTER L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT FILED; Name: SMITH, SYLVESTER L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: EXHIBITS; Name: SMITH, SYLVESTER L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: EXHIBITS; Name: SMITH, SYLVESTER L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: SMITH, SYLVESTER L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL; Name: SMITH, SYLVESTER L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less