This case was last updated from Van Buren County Courts on 06/13/2022 at 20:14:01 (UTC).

RICHARD TIMMY CATES -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 01/14/2022 RICHARD TIMMY CATES -NON-TRIAL was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Van Buren County Courts, Van Buren County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is CLARK. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****22-4

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Van Buren, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

CLARK

 

Party Details

Decedent

CATES, RICHARD TIMMY

Not Yet Classified

LEVINE, MARY LOU

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

MORGAN, NATHAN ST. JOHN

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT COLLECTION SM ESTAT$

01/14/2022: AFFIDAVIT COLLECTION SM ESTAT$

NOTICE - OTHER

01/27/2022: NOTICE - OTHER

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

02/14/2022: PROOF OF PUBLICATION

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: PROOF OF PUBLICATION; Name: MORGAN, NATHAN ST. JOHN; Entry: AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE - OTHER; Name: MORGAN, NATHAN ST. JOHN; Entry: NOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER; Entry: TRIAL TYPE: N

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $25.00 was made on receipt 71CI3743.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: MORGAN, NATHAN ST. JOHN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: DEATH CERTIFICATE; Name: MORGAN, NATHAN ST. JOHN; Entry: DEATH CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET PROBATE; Name: MORGAN, NATHAN ST. JOHN; Entry: COVERSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT COLLECTION SM ESTAT$; Name: MORGAN, NATHAN ST. JOHN; Entry: AFFIDAVIT FOR COLLECTION OF SMALL ESTATE BY DISTRIBUTEE

    Read MoreRead Less