This case was last updated from Jefferson County Courts on 05/25/2022 at 16:48:07 (UTC).

REGENCY ARMS LLC V NIGEL GUISINGER -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 01/20/2022 REGENCY ARMS LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against NIGEL GUISINGER -NON-TRIAL. This case was filed in Jefferson County Courts, Jefferson County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is DENNIS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2-44

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Jefferson, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

DENNIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REGENCY ARMS LLC

Defendant

GUISINGER, NIGEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

BENNETT, PAUL THOMAS

BURNETT JR., RONALD SCHROEDER

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

01/20/2022: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

01/24/2022: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

04/05/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

ANSWER FILED

05/03/2022: ANSWER FILED

ANSWER TO COUNTER CLAIM

05/12/2022: ANSWER TO COUNTER CLAIM

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER TO COUNTER CLAIM; Name: BENNETT, PAUL THOMAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER FILED; Name: BURNETT JR., RONALD SCHROEDER; Entry: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT AND COUNTERCLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Name: BENNETT, PAUL THOMAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $167.50 was made on receipt 35CI4881.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: BENNETT, PAUL THOMAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: BENNETT, PAUL THOMAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: BENNETT, PAUL THOMAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL; Name: BENNETT, PAUL THOMAS

    Read MoreRead Less