This case was last updated from Crawford County Courts on 01/24/2022 at 07:55:25 (UTC).

Q.R.E & LESTER, MELLISA, & HEATHER CUMMINS

Case Summary

On 04/07/2021 Q R E LESTER, MELLISA, HEATHER CUMMINS was filed as a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in Crawford County Courts, Crawford County District Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1-76

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Crawford, Arkansas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

QUANTUM REAL ESTATE LLC

Defendants

CUMMINS, HEATHER

CUMMINS, MELISSA

CUMMINS, LESTER

 

Court Documents

SC COMPLAINT FILED $65

04/07/2021: SC COMPLAINT FILED $65

LETTER FROM COURT

04/07/2021: LETTER FROM COURT

LETTER FROM COURT

04/07/2021: LETTER FROM COURT

FILING - OTHER

04/08/2021: FILING - OTHER

ORDER VACATE OR SHOW CAUSE

04/07/2021: ORDER VACATE OR SHOW CAUSE

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: TRIAL CANCELLED; Entry: CASE REMOVED FROM 4/14/2021 DOCKET DUE TO NOT OBTAINING SERVICE ON THE DEFENDANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: FILING - OTHER; Entry: ACKNOWLEDGMENT SIGNED BY PLAINITIFF/AGENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER VACATE OR SHOW CAUSE; Entry: PLAINTIFF TO DELIVER TO CCSO FOR SERVICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: LETTER FROM COURT; Entry: LETTER TO DEFENDANTS REGARDING COURT DATE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: LETTER FROM COURT; Entry: LETTER TO PLAINTIFF REGARDING COURT DATE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: TRIAL SCHEDULED; Entry: SET FOR 4-14-2021 AT 9 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of -$65.00 was made on receipt 17VA114192.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SC COMPLAINT FILED $65; Name: QUANTUM REAL ESTATE LLC,

    Read MoreRead Less