This case was last updated from Crittenden County Courts on 01/26/2022 at 20:18:08 (UTC).

PUGH PARTNERSHIP LP V VASHUNDA WATSON

Case Summary

On 05/13/2021 PUGH PARTNERSHIP LP filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against VASHUNDA WATSON. This case was filed in Crittenden County Courts, Crittenden County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is ELLINGTON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-289

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Crittenden, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

ELLINGTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PUGH PROPERTIES LP

Defendant

WATSON, VASHUNDA N

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SUMPTER, DENNY

 

Court Documents

CV COMPLAINT FILED

05/13/2021: CV COMPLAINT FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/13/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE - OTHER

05/13/2021: NOTICE - OTHER

SUMMONS SERVED

05/17/2021: SUMMONS SERVED

MOTION DISMISS

05/25/2021: MOTION DISMISS

ORDER TO DISMISS

05/28/2021: ORDER TO DISMISS

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC DISPOSITION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER TO DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOD DISMISSED; Entry: TRIAL TYPE:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS SERVED; Name: WATSON, VASHUNDA N; Entry: 5/17/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE - OTHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED; Name: WATSON, VASHUNDA N

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: CV COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SUMPTER, DENNY