This case was last updated from Craighead County Courts on 07/28/2022 at 01:35:59 (UTC).

PROGRESSIVE DIRECT INSURANCE VS KEYNON BRAGG

Case Summary

On 01/21/2022 PROGRESSIVE DIRECT INSURANCE filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against KEYNON BRAGG. This case was filed in Craighead County Courts, Craighead County District Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2-17

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Craighead, Arkansas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PROGRESSIVE DIRECT INSURANCE

Defendant

BRAGG, KEYNON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

JACKSON, JOY N

 

Court Documents

CV COMPLAINT FILED $

01/21/2022: CV COMPLAINT FILED $

SUMMONS ISSUED FEE

01/21/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED FEE

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

05/10/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

06/07/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

JUDGMENT-DEFAULT

06/10/2022: JUDGMENT-DEFAULT

MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT

06/10/2022: MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: JUDGMENT-DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Entry: SERVICE 03/18/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of -$82.50 was made on receipt 16JO131101.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED FEE; Name: PROGRESSIVE DIRECT INSURANCE,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: CV COMPLAINT FILED $; Name: PROGRESSIVE DIRECT INSURANCE,

    Read MoreRead Less