This case was last updated from Crawford County Arkansas Courts on 09/26/2022 at 14:21:20 (UTC).

PROFESSIONAL CREDIT MGMT V SHERRY J WOODARD

Case Summary

On 11/18/2021 PROFESSIONAL CREDIT MGMT filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SHERRY J WOODARD. This case was filed in Crawford County Arkansas Courts, Crawford County District Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The case status is Pending - Trial.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-603

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Trial

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Crawford, Arkansas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PROFFESSIONAL CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC

Defendant

WOODARD, SHERRY J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SINGLETON, KYLE

 

Court Documents

CV COMPLAINT FILED $

11/18/2021: CV COMPLAINT FILED $

MOTION EXTEND SERVICE TIME

02/28/2022: MOTION EXTEND SERVICE TIME

ORDER EXTEND SERVICE TIME

03/01/2022: ORDER EXTEND SERVICE TIME

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

05/13/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT

07/15/2022: MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT-DEFAULT

07/15/2022: JUDGMENT-DEFAULT

WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED

08/08/2022: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED

ANSWER FROM GARNISHEE

09/19/2022: ANSWER FROM GARNISHEE

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER FROM GARNISHEE; Entry: GARNISHEE FILED AN ANSWER AND INTERROGATORY RESPONSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of -$10.00 was made on receipt 17VA129297.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED; Name: PROFFESSIONAL CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC,; Entry: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT WAS ISSUED FOR JUDGMENT AND COSTS. PLAINTIFF FILED ALLEGATIONS AND INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: JUDGMENT-DEFAULT; Entry: JUDGE BAKER SIGNED APPROVING DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT IN THE AMOUNT OF $2,861.14, ATTORNEY FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $80.00, CURRENT COURT COST IN THE AMOUNT OF $143.53 PLUS INTEREST AT THE RATE OF 3.75% PER ANNUM. DEFENDANT SHALL WITHIN 45 DAYS OF THE RECEIPT OF THIS JUDGMENT FILE A SCHEDULE VERIFIED BY AFFIDAVIT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT; Entry: ATTY FOR PLAINTIFF FILED MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Entry: AFFIDAVIT SERVICE SERVED ON 04/12/22 BY PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER JULIE OLIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER EXTEND SERVICE TIME; Entry: JUDGE BAKER SIGNED ORDER TO EXTEND TIME FOR SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION EXTEND SERVICE TIME; Entry: ATTY FOR PLAINTIFF FILED MOTION TO EXTEND TIME FOR SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of -$80.00 was made on receipt 17VA121903.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: CV COMPLAINT FILED $; Name: PROFFESSIONAL CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC,

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SINGLETON, KYLE