This case was last updated from Crawford County Courts on 05/23/2022 at 11:59:13 (UTC).

PROFESSIONAL CREDIT MGMT V BRITANY L. WILLIAMS

Case Summary

On 03/17/2021 PROFESSIONAL CREDIT MGMT filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BRITANY L WILLIAMS. This case was filed in Crawford County Courts, Crawford County District Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-151

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Crawford, Arkansas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PROFFESSIONAL CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC

Defendant

WILLIAMS, BRITANY L.

Garnishee

SOUTHERN PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SINGLETON, KYLE L

 

Court Documents

CV COMPLAINT FILED $

03/17/2021: CV COMPLAINT FILED $

SUMMONS SERVED

05/10/2021: SUMMONS SERVED

JUDGMENT-DEFAULT

07/19/2021: JUDGMENT-DEFAULT

WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED

10/15/2021: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

12/14/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of -$10.00 was made on receipt 17VA121192.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED; Name: PROFFESSIONAL CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC,; Entry: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED FOR JUDGMENT AND COSTS. PLAINTIFF FILED ALLEGATIONS AND INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: JUDGMENT-DEFAULT; Entry: JUDGE BAKER SIGNED DEFAULT JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF THE PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS SERVED; Name: PROFFESSIONAL CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC,; Entry: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT SERVED TO DEFENDANT ON 4-22-2021 VIA CERTIFIED MAIL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of -$80.00 was made on receipt 17VA113955.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: CV COMPLAINT FILED $; Name: PROFFESSIONAL CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC,

    Read MoreRead Less