This case was last updated from Pulaski County Courts on 05/02/2022 at 11:29:41 (UTC).

PROFESSIONAL CREDIT MANAGEMENT V SHANNA L MARKS

Case Summary

On 02/24/2021 PROFESSIONAL CREDIT MANAGEMENT filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SHANNA L MARKS. This case was filed in Pulaski County Courts, Pulaski County District Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is GRUBER, W. The case status is Pending - Trial.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-256

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Trial

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Pulaski, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

GRUBER, W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PROFESSIONAL CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC

Defendant

MARKS, SHANNA L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SINGLETON, KYLE L

 

Court Documents

CV COMPLAINT FILED $

02/24/2021: CV COMPLAINT FILED $

SUMMONS ISSUED

02/24/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED

MOTION EXTEND SERVICE TIME

06/08/2021: MOTION EXTEND SERVICE TIME

ORDER EXTEND SERVICE TIME

06/08/2021: ORDER EXTEND SERVICE TIME

SUMMONS - PROCESS SERVER

08/06/2021: SUMMONS - PROCESS SERVER

MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT

08/23/2021: MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT-DEFAULT

08/25/2021: JUDGMENT-DEFAULT

WRIT OF GARNISHMENT FILED

09/28/2021: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT FILED

WRIT OF GARNISHMENT FILED

12/30/2021: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT FILED

ANSWER FROM GARNISHEE

01/20/2022: ANSWER FROM GARNISHEE

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

02/07/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

ORDER DISBURSE FUNDS

02/10/2022: ORDER DISBURSE FUNDS

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER DISBURSE FUNDS; Name: PROFESSIONAL CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC,; Entry: ARKANSAS DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Name: PROFESSIONAL CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC,; Entry: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FOR GARNISHMENT ARK DEP OF CORRECTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER FROM GARNISHEE; Entry: ARKANSAS DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of -$10.00 was made on receipt 60PC191174.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT FILED; Name: PROFESSIONAL CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC,; Entry: ARKANSAS DEAPRTMENT OF CORRECTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of -$10.00 was made on receipt 60PC187672.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT FILED; Name: PROFESSIONAL CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC,; Entry: ADCC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: JUDGMENT-DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS - PROCESS SERVER; Entry: SHANNA L MARKS SERVED ON 7-09-2021 PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER EXTEND SERVICE TIME; Name: PROFESSIONAL CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION EXTEND SERVICE TIME; Name: PROFESSIONAL CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of -$80.00 was made on receipt 60PC179045.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED; Name: PROFESSIONAL CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: DATE CLAIM AROSE; Name: PROFESSIONAL CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: CV COMPLAINT FILED $; Name: PROFESSIONAL CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC,

    Read MoreRead Less