This case was last updated from Crawford County Courts on 05/13/2022 at 01:06:26 (UTC).

PROFESSIONAL CREDIT MANAGEMENT V DAVID W. LAWSON

Case Summary

On 02/08/2021 PROFESSIONAL CREDIT MANAGEMENT filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DAVID W LAWSON. This case was filed in Crawford County Courts, Crawford County District Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The case status is Pending - Trial.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1-94

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Trial

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Crawford, Arkansas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PROFFESSIONAL CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC

Defendant

LAWSON, DAVID W

Garnishee

CITY OF FORT SMITH ARKANSAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SINGLETON, KYLE L

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

12/27/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

ANSWER FROM GARNISHEE

12/20/2021: ANSWER FROM GARNISHEE

WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED

11/23/2021: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED

MOTION SUMMARY JUDGMENT

10/12/2021: MOTION SUMMARY JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT-SUMMARY

10/21/2021: JUDGMENT-SUMMARY

MOTION HEARING CONTINUED

10/12/2021: MOTION HEARING CONTINUED

MOTION SUMMARY JUDGMENT

10/12/2021: MOTION SUMMARY JUDGMENT

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

09/14/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

09/08/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

09/07/2021: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

LETTER FROM COURT

08/30/2021: LETTER FROM COURT

LETTER FROM COURT

08/30/2021: LETTER FROM COURT

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

08/24/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

ANSWER DENYING CLAIM

08/24/2021: ANSWER DENYING CLAIM

ORDER EXTEND SERVICE TIME

05/24/2021: ORDER EXTEND SERVICE TIME

AFFIDAVIT FILED

05/24/2021: AFFIDAVIT FILED

MOTION EXTEND SERVICE TIME

05/24/2021: MOTION EXTEND SERVICE TIME

CV COMPLAINT FILED $

02/08/2021: CV COMPLAINT FILED $

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER FROM GARNISHEE; Entry: GARNISHEE FILED AN ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of -$10.00 was made on receipt 17VA121868.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED; Name: PROFFESSIONAL CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC,; Entry: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT WAS ISSUED ON JUDGEMENT AND COSTS. PLAINTIFF FILED ALLEGATIONS AND INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: JUDGMENT-SUMMARY; Entry: JUDGE BAKER SIGNED ORDER GRANTING SUMMARY JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: TRIAL CANCELLED; Entry: TRIAL WAS CANCELLED DUE TO SUMMARY JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: PHONE CONTACT; Entry: ATTY REQUESTED THAT THIS BE CONTINUED; ATTY'S OFFICE HAS TRIED MUTIPLE TIMES TO CONTACT DEFT WITHOUT SUCCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Entry: ATTY FOR PLAINTIFF FILED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION HEARING CONTINUED; Entry: ATTY FOR PLAINTIFF FILED MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE- ATTY'S OFFICE WAS CALLED TO REQUEST AN ORDER BE SENT CONTAINING A NEW COURT DATE THAT BOTH PARTIES AGREE TO CONTINUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Entry: ATTY FOR PLAINTIFF FILED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Entry: ATTY FOR PLAINTIFF FILED REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: LETTER FROM COURT; Entry: LETTERS TO NOTIFY ALL PARTIES OF COURT DATE AND TIME WERE MAIILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: TRIAL SCHEDULED; Entry: COURT DATE IS SET FOR OCTOBER 27TH, 2021 @ 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Entry: PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER DENYING CLAIM; Entry: DEFT FILED ANSWER DENYING THE CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER EXTEND SERVICE TIME; Entry: JUDGE BAKER GRANTS ORDER TO EXTEND TIME FOR SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT FILED; Entry: PLAINTIFF FILES AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION EXTEND SERVICE TIME; Entry: PLAINTIFF SENT IN MOTION AND BRIEF TO EXTEND TIME FOR SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of -$80.00 was made on receipt 17VA112481.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: CV COMPLAINT FILED $; Name: PROFFESSIONAL CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC,

    Read MoreRead Less