This case was last updated from Pulaski County Courts on 04/21/2022 at 11:43:42 (UTC).

PRO CRED MNGMNT INC V ZIEGLER

Case Summary

On 01/22/2021 PRO CRED MNGMNT INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ZIEGLER. This case was filed in Pulaski County Courts, Pulaski County District Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is GRUBER, W. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-107

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Pulaski, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

GRUBER, W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PROFESSIONAL CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC

Defendant

ZIEGLER, KACEY D

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SINGLETON, KYLE L

 

Court Documents

CV COMPLAINT FILED $

01/22/2021: CV COMPLAINT FILED $

SUMMONS SERVED

04/14/2021: SUMMONS SERVED

MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT

04/26/2021: MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT-DEFAULT

04/30/2021: JUDGMENT-DEFAULT

WRIT OF GARNISHMENT FILED

06/29/2021: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT FILED

WRIT SERVED

08/02/2021: WRIT SERVED

SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED

08/30/2021: SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED

NOTICE - OTHER

11/22/2021: NOTICE - OTHER

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE - OTHER; Entry: GARNISHMENT RELEASE MG NASH PA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: WRIT SERVED; Entry: GARNISHEE SERVICE MG NASH PA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of -$10.00 was made on receipt 60PC183834.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT FILED; Name: PROFESSIONAL CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC,; Entry: MG NASH PA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: JUDGMENT-DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS SERVED; Entry: KACEY D ZIEGLER SUMMONS SERVED ON 3/8/21 BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of -$80.00 was made on receipt 60PC177958.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: DATE CLAIM AROSE; Name: PROFESSIONAL CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: CV COMPLAINT FILED $; Name: PROFESSIONAL CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC,

    Read MoreRead Less