This case was last updated from Boone County Arkansas Courts on 12/29/2022 at 21:16:04 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES V NICHOLE MATLOCK -JURY TRIAL

Case Summary

On 09/08/2022 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against NICHOLE MATLOCK -JURY TRIAL. This case was filed in Boone County Arkansas Courts, Boone County Circuit Court located in Conway, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is BAILEY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-257

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Boone, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

BAILEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC

Defendant

MATLOCK, NICHOLE M

Harrison, AR 72601

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SANDERS, JENNIFER

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

09/08/2022: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

09/08/2022: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

09/16/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT

10/18/2022: MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT-DEFAULT

10/20/2022: JUDGMENT-DEFAULT

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: CASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER; Entry: TRIAL TYPE: J

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: JUDGMENT-DEFAULT; Name: 14TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 1,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT; Name: SANDERS, JENNIFER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC DISPOSITION SHEET; Name: SANDERS, JENNIFER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Name: SANDERS, JENNIFER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $167.50 was made on receipt 05CI4210.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: SANDERS, JENNIFER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: SANDERS, JENNIFER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: SANDERS, JENNIFER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL; Name: SANDERS, JENNIFER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SANDERS, JENNIFER