This case was last updated from Pulaski County Courts on 01/22/2022 at 08:20:00 (UTC).

PORT REC ASSC LLC V GUEVARA

Case Summary

On 02/22/2021 PORT REC ASSC LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GUEVARA. This case was filed in Pulaski County Courts, Pulaski County District Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is GRUBER, W. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-285

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Pulaski, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

GRUBER, W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC

Defendant

GUEVARA, MARINA

Little Rock, AR 72204-8645

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SANDERS, JENNIFER

 

Court Documents

CV COMPLAINT FILED $

02/22/2021: CV COMPLAINT FILED $

SUMMONS ISSUED

02/22/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS - PROCESS SERVER

05/03/2021: SUMMONS - PROCESS SERVER

MOTION TO NON SUIT

08/30/2021: MOTION TO NON SUIT

ORDER TO NON SUIT

08/31/2021: ORDER TO NON SUIT

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER TO NON SUIT; Name: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC,; Entry: WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION TO NON SUIT; Name: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS - PROCESS SERVER; Entry: MARINA GUEVARA SERVED ON 3-22-21 BY SUB SERVICE (SON) CARLOS GUZMAN PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of -$82.50 was made on receipt 60PC179127.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED; Name: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: DATE CLAIM AROSE; Name: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: CV COMPLAINT FILED $; Name: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC,

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SANDERS, JENNIFER