This case was last updated from Columbia County Courts on 10/16/2022 at 04:05:58 (UTC).

PEOPLES BANK V JORDAN JACOBS

Case Summary

On 01/24/2022 PEOPLES BANK filed an Other lawsuit against JORDAN JACOBS. This case was filed in Columbia County Courts, Columbia County Circuit Court located in Crawford, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is SINGLETON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2-26

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

SINGLETON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PEOPLE'S BANK

Defendant

JACOBS, JORDAN SETH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PHILLIPS, RYAN P

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED

01/24/2022: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/24/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED

RETURN OF SERVICE

03/04/2022: RETURN OF SERVICE

MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT

04/07/2022: MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT-DEFAULT

04/24/2022: JUDGMENT-DEFAULT

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC DISPOSITION SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: JUDGMENT-DEFAULT; Name: 13TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 6,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER; Entry: NON-TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: CASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT; Name: PHILLIPS, RYAN P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: RETURN OF SERVICE; Name: PHILLIPS, RYAN P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less