This case was last updated from Columbia County Courts on 01/14/2023 at 20:17:31 (UTC).

PEOPLES BANK V DARELL TROTTER & RETIA FIELDS

Case Summary

On 01/24/2022 PEOPLES BANK filed an Other lawsuit against DARELL TROTTER RETIA FIELDS. This case was filed in Columbia County Courts, Columbia County Circuit Court located in Conway, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is SINGLETON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2-27

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

SINGLETON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PEOPLE'S BANK

Defendants

FIELDS, RETIA FAYE

TROTTER, DARELL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PHILLIPS, RYAN P

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED

01/24/2022: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/24/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/24/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED

PETITION

04/11/2022: PETITION

PETITION

04/12/2022: PETITION

WARNING ORDER ISSUED BY CLERK

04/21/2022: WARNING ORDER ISSUED BY CLERK

WARNING ORDER ISSUED BY CLERK

04/21/2022: WARNING ORDER ISSUED BY CLERK

ORDER OTHER

05/02/2022: ORDER OTHER

ORDER OTHER

05/02/2022: ORDER OTHER

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

05/12/2022: PROOF OF PUBLICATION

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

05/19/2022: PROOF OF PUBLICATION

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

05/23/2022: PROOF OF PUBLICATION

MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT

06/29/2022: MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT-DEFAULT

07/27/2022: JUDGMENT-DEFAULT

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC DISPOSITION SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: JUDGMENT-DEFAULT; Name: 13TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 6,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER; Entry: NON-TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: CASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT; Name: PHILLIPS, RYAN P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: PROOF OF PUBLICATION; Name: PHILLIPS, RYAN P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: PROOF OF PUBLICATION; Name: PHILLIPS, RYAN P; Entry: DARREL TROTTER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: PROOF OF PUBLICATION; Name: PHILLIPS, RYAN P; Entry: Trotter Proof of Publication

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER OTHER; Entry: GRANTING PETITION FOR WARNING ORDER RE: RETIA FAYE FIELDS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER OTHER; Entry: GRANTING PETITION FOR WARNING ORDER RE: DARELL MONTREL TROTTER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: WARNING ORDER ISSUED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: NO ACTION TAKEN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: PETITION; Name: PHILLIPS, RYAN P; Entry: FOR WARNING ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: NO ACTION TAKEN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: PETITION; Name: PHILLIPS, RYAN P; Entry: FOR WARNING ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED; Entry: DARELL TROTTER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED; Entry: RETIA FIELDS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less