This case was last updated from Craighead County Courts on 08/13/2022 at 08:07:43 (UTC).

PCM VS BRANDI & JOSHUA COOPER

Case Summary

On 01/19/2022 PCM filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BRANDI JOSHUA COOPER. This case was filed in Craighead County Courts, Craighead County District Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The case status is Pending - Trial.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2-15

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Trial

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Craighead, Arkansas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PROFESSIONAL CREDIT, MANAGEMENT

Defendants

COOPER, JOSHUA

COOPER, BRANDI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

SINGLETON, KYLE L

 

Court Documents

CV COMPLAINT FILED $

01/19/2022: CV COMPLAINT FILED $

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

02/23/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

02/24/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT

03/30/2022: MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT-DEFAULT

03/30/2022: JUDGMENT-DEFAULT

WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED

06/29/2022: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED

ANSWER FROM GARNISHEE

07/14/2022: ANSWER FROM GARNISHEE

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER FROM GARNISHEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of -$10.00 was made on receipt 16JO143701.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED; Name: PROFESSIONAL CREDIT, MANAGEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: JUDGMENT-DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Entry: JOSHUA COOPER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of -$80.00 was made on receipt 16JO130913.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: CV COMPLAINT FILED $; Name: PROFESSIONAL CREDIT, MANAGEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less