This case was last updated from Miller County Courts on 01/30/2023 at 18:39:02 (UTC).

PATRICIA VALENCE V SHAWN VALENCE

Case Summary

On 01/13/2023 PATRICIA VALENCE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against SHAWN VALENCE. This case was filed in Miller County Courts, Miller County Circuit Court located in Nevada, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is JONES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3-16

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Miller, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

JONES

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

VALENCE, PATRICIA ANN

PAYNE, PATRICIA ANN

Defendant

VALENCE, SHAWN ALFRED

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

01/13/2023: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND WAIVER

01/13/2023: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND WAIVER

LETTER SETTING COURT DATE

01/26/2023: LETTER SETTING COURT DATE

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: LETTER SETTING COURT DATE; Entry: February 16, 2023 at 9am

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of -$165.00 was made on receipt 46CI48863.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND WAIVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET DOMESTIC REL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less