This case was last updated from Garland County Courts on 01/20/2022 at 19:38:15 (UTC).

PAM & GARY SMITH V DAVID KINNEAR

Case Summary

On 01/12/2021 PAM GARY SMITH filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DAVID KINNEAR. This case was filed in Garland County Courts, Garland County District Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****21-4

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Garland, Arkansas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SMITH, PAMELA KAY

SMITH, GARY

COOK, PAMELA KAY

PRATT, PAMELA KAY

Defendant

KINNEAR, DAVID

 

Court Documents

SC COMPLAINT FILED $65

01/12/2021: SC COMPLAINT FILED $65

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/12/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

01/21/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

ANSWER DENYING CLAIM

02/04/2021: ANSWER DENYING CLAIM

SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED

02/10/2021: SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED; Entry: RECEIVED SATISFACTION FROM PAM SMITH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER DENYING CLAIM; Entry: RECEIVED ANSWER FROM DEFT DENYING CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Entry: PROOF OF SERVICE BY SHERIFF'S OFFICE ON 1/14/21 TO PAUL DOWNS AT SOUTHERN TRADING & PAWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of -$65.00 was made on receipt 26HT171641.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED; Name: KINNEAR, DAVID

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SC COMPLAINT FILED $65; Name: SMITH, PAMELA KAY

    Read MoreRead Less