This case was last updated from Benton County Courts on 05/21/2022 at 12:06:32 (UTC).

OZARK MANAGEMENT COMPANY LLC V ASHBY STREET OUT -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 09/01/2021 OZARK MANAGEMENT COMPANY LLC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against ASHBY STREET OUT -NON-TRIAL. This case was filed in Benton County Courts, Benton County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is DUNCAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2095

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Benton, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

DUNCAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OZARK MANAGEMENT COMPANY LLC

Defendants

LAMAR ADVERTISING OF FORTH SMITH AR

ASHBY STREET OUTDOOR LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BROWN, J GREG

Defendant Attorneys

TUCKER, K C DUPPS

COPPER, SARAH CATHERINE

BOEHLER, KRISTY ELIZABETH

 

Court Documents

NOTICE HEARING SCHEDULED

04/22/2022: NOTICE HEARING SCHEDULED

ORDER MOTION DENIED

02/28/2022: ORDER MOTION DENIED

RESPONSE TO MOTION FILED

01/12/2022: RESPONSE TO MOTION FILED

ANSWER TO COUNTER CLAIM

12/27/2021: ANSWER TO COUNTER CLAIM

MOTION DISMISS

12/27/2021: MOTION DISMISS

EXHIBITS

12/14/2021: EXHIBITS

EXHIBITS

12/14/2021: EXHIBITS

EXHIBITS

12/14/2021: EXHIBITS

EXHIBITS

12/14/2021: EXHIBITS

EXHIBITS

12/14/2021: EXHIBITS

ANSWER WITH COUNTER CLAIM

12/14/2021: ANSWER WITH COUNTER CLAIM

MOTION OTHER

12/01/2021: MOTION OTHER

EXHIBITS

11/30/2021: EXHIBITS

EXHIBITS

11/30/2021: EXHIBITS

EXHIBITS

11/30/2021: EXHIBITS

EXHIBITS

11/30/2021: EXHIBITS

EXHIBITS

11/30/2021: EXHIBITS

RESPONSE TO MOTION FILED

11/30/2021: RESPONSE TO MOTION FILED

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE HEARING SCHEDULED; Entry: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE SET ON 5/2/2022 AT 1:15 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER MOTION DENIED; Name: 19TH WEST CIRCUIT DIVISION 5,; Entry: PETITIONERS MOTION TO DISMISS RESPONDENTS COUNTERCLAIM IS DENIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: RESPONSE TO MOTION FILED; Name: COPPER, SARAH CATHERINE; Entry: ASHBY STREET OUTDOOR LLC DBA LAMAR ADVERTISING OF FT SMITH AR RESPONSE TO OZARK MANAGEMENT COMPANY LLC'S MOTION TO DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER TO COUNTER CLAIM; Name: BROWN, J GREG; Entry: PETITIONERS ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION DISMISS; Name: BROWN, J GREG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: EXHIBITS; Name: TUCKER, K C DUPPS; Entry: EXHIBIT 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: EXHIBITS; Name: TUCKER, K C DUPPS; Entry: EXHIBIT 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: EXHIBITS; Name: TUCKER, K C DUPPS; Entry: EXHIBIT 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: EXHIBITS; Name: TUCKER, K C DUPPS; Entry: EXHIBIT 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: EXHIBITS; Name: TUCKER, K C DUPPS; Entry: EXHIBIT 1

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Name: BROWN, J GREG; Entry: ASHBY STREET OUTDOOR LLC 9/22/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Name: BROWN, J GREG; Entry: LAMAR ADVERTISING OF FORT SMITH AR 9/22/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $170.00 was made on receipt 04CI72543.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: BROWN, J GREG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: BROWN, J GREG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: BROWN, J GREG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED; Name: BROWN, J GREG; Entry: LAMAR ADVERTISING OF FORTH SMITH AR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: BROWN, J GREG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED; Name: BROWN, J GREG; Entry: ASHBY STREET OUTDOOR LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL; Name: BROWN, J GREG

    Read MoreRead Less