This case was last updated from Boone County Arkansas Courts on 01/11/2023 at 22:00:36 (UTC).

ONIE LEE BECK -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 09/08/2022 ONIE LEE BECK -NON-TRIAL was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Boone County Arkansas Courts, Boone County District Court located in Conway, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is LAYTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-156

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Boone, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

LAYTON

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BECK, DAMON AUBREY

Decedent

BECK, ONIE LEE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

DAVIS, STEVEN B

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

09/08/2022: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

ORDER APPT ADMINISTRATOR/IX

09/08/2022: ORDER APPT ADMINISTRATOR/IX

ACCEPT APPT ADMINISTRATOR/IX

09/08/2022: ACCEPT APPT ADMINISTRATOR/IX

LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

09/08/2022: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

DESIGNATION OF PROCESS AGENT

09/08/2022: DESIGNATION OF PROCESS AGENT

AFFIDAVIT CLAIM AGAINST ESTATE

09/09/2022: AFFIDAVIT CLAIM AGAINST ESTATE

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

09/30/2022: PROOF OF PUBLICATION

AFFIDAVIT CLAIM AGAINST ESTATE

10/27/2022: AFFIDAVIT CLAIM AGAINST ESTATE

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT CLAIM AGAINST ESTATE; Entry: [boone co tax collector; amendment]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: PROOF OF PUBLICATION; Name: DAVIS, STEVEN B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT CLAIM AGAINST ESTATE; Entry: [boone co tax collector]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: DESIGNATION OF PROCESS AGENT; Name: DAVIS, STEVEN B; Entry: Appointment of Agent for Service of Process

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ACCEPT APPT ADMINISTRATOR/IX; Name: DAVIS, STEVEN B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER APPT ADMINISTRATOR/IX; Name: 14TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 2,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $165.00 was made on receipt 05CO1392.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: DAVIS, STEVEN B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: DAVIS, STEVEN B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET PROBATE; Name: DAVIS, STEVEN B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less