This case was last updated from Faulkner County Courts on 02/11/2022 at 13:38:54 (UTC).

OLD CONWAY VILLAGE, LP V KEM FORD -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 06/15/2021 OLD CONWAY VILLAGE, LP filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against KEM FORD -NON-TRIAL. This case was filed in Faulkner County Courts, Faulkner County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is WEAVER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-684

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Faulkner, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

WEAVER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OLD CONWAY VILLAGE, LP

Defendants

WHITE, LATOYA

BUTLER, JASON

FORD, KEN

BUTLER, JALEN

FORD, KEM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JILES, GARY DEWAYNE

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

06/15/2021: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/15/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/15/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/15/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/15/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED

AMENDED COMPLAINT

06/17/2021: AMENDED COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/18/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS SERVED

06/21/2021: SUMMONS SERVED

WRIT OF POSSESSION$

06/29/2021: WRIT OF POSSESSION$

WRIT OF POSSESSION$

07/01/2021: WRIT OF POSSESSION$

WRIT SERVED

07/07/2021: WRIT SERVED

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: WRIT SERVED; Entry: 7-6-21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $20.00 was made on receipt 23CI20559.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: WRIT OF POSSESSION$; Name: JILES, GARY DEWAYNE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $20.00 was made on receipt 23CI20531.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: WRIT OF POSSESSION$; Name: JILES, GARY DEWAYNE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS SERVED; Name: JILES, GARY DEWAYNE; Entry: Kem Ford 6/20/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $2.50 was made on receipt 23CI20350.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: JILES, GARY DEWAYNE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED; Name: JILES, GARY DEWAYNE; Entry: KEM FORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AMENDED COMPLAINT; Name: JILES, GARY DEWAYNE

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED; Name: JILES, GARY DEWAYNE; Entry: LATOYA WHITE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED; Name: JILES, GARY DEWAYNE; Entry: KEN FORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED; Name: JILES, GARY DEWAYNE; Entry: JASON BUTLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED; Name: JILES, GARY DEWAYNE; Entry: JALEN BUTLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: JILES, GARY DEWAYNE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: JILES, GARY DEWAYNE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: JILES, GARY DEWAYNE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: JILES, GARY DEWAYNE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: JILES, GARY DEWAYNE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL; Name: JILES, GARY DEWAYNE

    Read MoreRead Less