This case was last updated from White County Courts on 01/26/2022 at 20:22:27 (UTC).

NU PROPERTIES AND INVESTMENTS LLC V TAWANA GENTRY

Case Summary

On 05/13/2021 NU PROPERTIES AND INVESTMENTS LLC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against TAWANA GENTRY. This case was filed in White County Courts, White County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is BROCK. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-271

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    White, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

BROCK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NU PROPERTIES AND INVESTMENTS

Defendant

GENTRY, TAWANA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GIBSON, BUCK CANYON

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED

05/13/2021: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/13/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE - OTHER

05/13/2021: NOTICE - OTHER

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

05/18/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

RESPONSE/REPLY

05/24/2021: RESPONSE/REPLY

NOTICE - OTHER

06/03/2021: NOTICE - OTHER

NOTICE - OTHER

06/03/2021: NOTICE - OTHER

NOTICE OF HEARING

06/04/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF HEARING

06/10/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING

AFFIDAVIT FILED

06/30/2021: AFFIDAVIT FILED

ORDER OTHER

06/30/2021: ORDER OTHER

ORDER SERVED

07/29/2021: ORDER SERVED

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER; Entry: TRIAL TYPE:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER OTHER; Entry: 2021-1204

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: OTHER HEARING HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: JUDGE NOTE; Entry: Pl. appeared for 10:00AM hearing. As of 10:20AM, Def failed to appear for hearing. Hearing conducted. Pl. entered Ex. 1 into evidence as proof of service served on Def. of notice of hearing time and location. Pl. met burden of proving lease previously expired. Def remained in possession after expiration. Def failed to comply with other terms of lease, including failure to maintain utilities. Judgment for Pl. for immediate possession and for fair rental value during unlawful detainment of premises. After conclusion of hearing, courtroom cleared for upcoming sealed/closed proceeding. -J. Brock

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE - OTHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE - OTHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: OTHER HEARING SCHEDULED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: RESPONSE/REPLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE - OTHER; Entry: NOTICE OF INTENT TO ISSUE WRIT OF POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less