This case was last updated from Columbia County Courts on 11/13/2022 at 17:02:00 (UTC).

NPU V MURAHARI KOLLURU ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/27/2022 NPU filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against MURAHARI KOLLURU. This case was filed in Columbia County Courts, Columbia County Circuit Court located in Crawford, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is SINGLETON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2-29

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

SINGLETON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NORTHWESTERN POLYTECHNIC UNIVERSITY

Defendant

MURAHARI, KOLLURU

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Plaintiff Attorney

WATSON JR, TIM F

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED

01/27/2022: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/27/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

02/23/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS SERVED

04/08/2022: SUMMONS SERVED

MOTION EXTEND SERVICE TIME

05/24/2022: MOTION EXTEND SERVICE TIME

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION EXTEND SERVICE TIME; Name: WATSON JR, TIM F

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: EFILING NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Name: WATSON JR, TIM F

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS SERVED; Name: WATSON JR, TIM F

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED; Entry: MURAHARI KOLLURU AND JOHN DOES 1-7

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED; Entry: MURAHARI KOLLURU

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WATSON JR, TIM F