This case was last updated from Columbia County Courts on 01/06/2023 at 13:06:44 (UTC).

NOVIE L BAGWELL

Case Summary

On 02/03/2022 NOVIE L BAGWELL was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Columbia County Courts, Columbia County District Court located in Conway, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is TALLEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****22-7

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

TALLEY

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CURTIS, RITA

Decedent

BAGWELL, NOVIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BOYD, MICHAEL W

Other Attorneys

HUTCHESON, JOEL ISSAC

 

Court Documents

PETITION

02/03/2022: PETITION

WAIVER

02/10/2022: WAIVER

AFFIDAVIT CLAIM AGAINST ESTATE

02/16/2022: AFFIDAVIT CLAIM AGAINST ESTATE

WAIVER

02/21/2022: WAIVER

ORDER APPOINT PERS REPRESENT

02/22/2022: ORDER APPOINT PERS REPRESENT

ACCEPT APPOINTMENT

02/23/2022: ACCEPT APPOINTMENT

LETTERS TESTAMENTARY

02/23/2022: LETTERS TESTAMENTARY

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

04/25/2022: PROOF OF PUBLICATION

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE

08/09/2022: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE

FILING - OTHER

09/12/2022: FILING - OTHER

RECEIPT FOR CASE FILE

10/21/2022: RECEIPT FOR CASE FILE

PET AUTH MAKE FINAL DISTRIB

10/25/2022: PET AUTH MAKE FINAL DISTRIB

ORDER AUTH FINAL DISTRIBUTION

10/28/2022: ORDER AUTH FINAL DISTRIBUTION

REPORT OF FINAL DISTRIBUTION

12/05/2022: REPORT OF FINAL DISTRIBUTION

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: REPORT OF FINAL DISTRIBUTION; Name: HUTCHESON, JOEL ISSAC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER AUTH FINAL DISTRIBUTION; Name: 13TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 5,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: PET AUTH MAKE FINAL DISTRIB; Name: HUTCHESON, JOEL ISSAC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: RECEIPT FOR CASE FILE; Entry: RECEIPT AND RELEASE OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: FILING - OTHER; Entry: CERTIFICATION OF CLAIMS FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE; Name: HUTCHESON, JOEL ISSAC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: PROOF OF PUBLICATION; Name: BOYD, MICHAEL W

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: LETTERS TESTAMENTARY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ACCEPT APPOINTMENT; Name: BOYD, MICHAEL W

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER APPOINT PERS REPRESENT; Name: 13TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 5,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: WAIVER; Name: BOYD, MICHAEL W; Entry: Entry of Appearance, Waiver of Notice, Waiver of Bond, and Waiver of Inventory and Accounting

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT CLAIM AGAINST ESTATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: WAIVER; Name: BOYD, MICHAEL W; Entry: Entry of Appearance, Waiver of Notice, Waiver of Bond, and Waiver of Inventory and Accounting

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: PETITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET PROBATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less