This case was last updated from Washington County Courts on 01/25/2022 at 09:40:48 (UTC).

NICHOLAS LEICHLITER -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 04/13/2021 NICHOLAS LEICHLITER -NON-TRIAL was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Washington County Courts, Washington County District Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is MARTIN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-328

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Washington, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

MARTIN

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LEICHLITER, RHONDA

Respondent

LEICHLITER, NICHOLAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

ANDERSON, COREY EVAN

 

Court Documents

STATEMENT OF RIGHTS

04/13/2021: STATEMENT OF RIGHTS

PETITION CIVIL COMMITMENT

04/13/2021: PETITION CIVIL COMMITMENT

ORDER CIVIL COMMITMENT

04/14/2021: ORDER CIVIL COMMITMENT

ORDER CONDITIONAL RELEASE

04/14/2021: ORDER CONDITIONAL RELEASE

WAIVER

04/16/2021: WAIVER

ORDER TO DISMISS

04/26/2021: ORDER TO DISMISS

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOD DISMISSED; Entry: TRIAL TYPE: N

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER TO DISMISS; Name: 4TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 1,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: WAIVER; Name: ANDERSON, COREY EVAN; Entry: Section 5 Waiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER CONDITIONAL RELEASE; Name: 4TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 1,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER CIVIL COMMITMENT; Name: 4TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 1,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: ANDERSON, COREY EVAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET PROBATE; Name: ANDERSON, COREY EVAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: PETITION CIVIL COMMITMENT; Name: ANDERSON, COREY EVAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: STATEMENT OF RIGHTS; Name: ANDERSON, COREY EVAN

    Read MoreRead Less