This case was last updated from Baxter County Courts on 01/22/2022 at 12:20:09 (UTC).

NATHANIEL ADAMS V PAUNEE ADAMS -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 02/25/2021 NATHANIEL ADAMS filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against PAUNEE ADAMS -NON-TRIAL. This case was filed in Baxter County Courts, Baxter County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is BAILEY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1-54

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Baxter, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

BAILEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ADAMS, NATHANIEL J

Defendant

ADAMS, PAUNEE P

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REED, EMILY C

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

02/25/2021: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

02/25/2021: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

02/26/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF HEARING

06/08/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING

FILING - OTHER

06/08/2021: FILING - OTHER

WAIVER CORROBORATION OF GROUND

06/17/2021: WAIVER CORROBORATION OF GROUND

AFFIDAVIT FILED

06/21/2021: AFFIDAVIT FILED

DEPOSITION

06/21/2021: DEPOSITION

DECREE OF DIVORCE

06/22/2021: DECREE OF DIVORCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC DISPOSITION SHEET; Name: REED, EMILY C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: FINAL DIVORCE HEARING CANCD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER; Entry: TRIAL TYPE: N

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: DIVORCE/ANNULMENT INFO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: DECREE OF DIVORCE; Name: 14TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 1,; Entry: DECREE OF ABSOLUTE DIVORCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: DEPOSITION; Name: REED, EMILY C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT FILED; Name: REED, EMILY C; Entry: Affidavit of Residency

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: WAIVER CORROBORATION OF GROUND; Name: REED, EMILY C; Entry: Waiver and Entry of Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: FILING - OTHER; Name: 14TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 1,; Entry: proof of mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE OF HEARING; Name: 14TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 1,; Entry: Hearing set 7/14/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Name: REED, EMILY C; Entry: PAUNEE ADAMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED; Entry: PAUNEE ADAMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $167.50 was made on receipt 03CI5106.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: REED, EMILY C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: REED, EMILY C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION SHEET; Name: REED, EMILY C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: REED, EMILY C; Entry: PETITION FOR DIVORCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET DOMESTIC REL; Name: REED, EMILY C

    Read MoreRead Less