This case was last updated from Crawford County Courts on 02/26/2022 at 21:22:46 (UTC).

MSCB, INC V CHRISTOPHER L BOND

Case Summary

On 06/18/2021 MSCB, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CHRISTOPHER L BOND. This case was filed in Crawford County Courts, Crawford County District Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-299

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Crawford, Arkansas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MSCB INC

Defendant

BOND, CHRISTOPHER L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EDWARDS, DAVID W

 

Court Documents

CV COMPLAINT FILED $

07/09/2021: CV COMPLAINT FILED $

SUMMONS ISSUED FEE

07/09/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED FEE

ANSWER WITH PARTIAL ADMIT

07/27/2021: ANSWER WITH PARTIAL ADMIT

LETTER FROM COURT

07/28/2021: LETTER FROM COURT

LETTER FROM COURT

07/28/2021: LETTER FROM COURT

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

08/16/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

MOTION CONTINUANCE

09/01/2021: MOTION CONTINUANCE

ORDER MOTION DENIED

09/09/2021: ORDER MOTION DENIED

JUDGMENT-DEFAULT

09/22/2021: JUDGMENT-DEFAULT

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: JUDGMENT-DEFAULT; Entry: JUDGE BAKER SIGNED JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: TRIAL HELD; Entry: TRIAL WAS HELD; ATTY FOR PLAINTIFF, DAVID EDWARDS APPEARED; DEFT DID NOT APPEAR; JUDGE BAKER RULED IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF AND ATTY SUBMITTED DEFAULT JUDGMENT WHICH JUDGE BAKER SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER MOTION DENIED; Entry: JUDGE BAKER DENIED MOTION TO CONTINUE- ATTY FOR PLAINTIFF WAS CONTACTED BY PHONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION CONTINUANCE; Entry: ATTY FOR PLAINTIFF FILED MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE TO RESCHEDULE FROM SEPTEMBER 22, 2021 TO NOVEMBER 3, 2021. IT WAS SUBMITTED TO JUDGE FOR CONSIDERATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: LETTER FROM COURT; Entry: LETTERS TO NOTIFY BOTH PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: TRIAL SCHEDULED; Entry: COURT DATE SET FOR SEPT 22, 2021 @ 9:00 AM LETTERS TO NOTIFY BOTH PARTIES WERE MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER WITH PARTIAL ADMIT; Entry: ANSWER FILED BY DEFT, PARTIALLY ADMITTING CLAIM, COURT DATE TO BE SET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of -$82.50 was made on receipt 17VA117403.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED FEE; Name: MSCB INC,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: CV COMPLAINT FILED $; Name: MSCB INC,

    Read MoreRead Less