This case was last updated from Van Buren County Courts on 08/02/2022 at 15:18:17 (UTC).

MOUNTAIN RIDGE CONDO V MICHAEL EUBANKS ET AL -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 01/13/2022 MOUNTAIN RIDGE CONDO filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against MICHAEL EUBANKS -NON-TRIAL. This case was filed in Van Buren County Courts, Van Buren County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is WEAVER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2-14

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Van Buren, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

WEAVER

 

Party Details

Defendants

CLAUSEN, CHRISTINA DOIDGE

ADAMS, AKA MARTHA GWEN ADAMS, MARTHA GIVEN

BRADSHAW, CONNIE LONIGRO

PEARSON, STANLEY W

PEARSON, LORNA M

SULLIVANT, JUDITH C

LEBER, DONALD W

LEBER, JOY B

BESS, MARY JANE

ANDERSON, MARILYN

TOMCZAK, JANIS K

O'TOOLE, DONALD

O'TOOLE, CINDY

BRADSHAW, ROBERT EDWIN

ADAMS, CARLEE GWEN

ADAMS, CAITLYN SCOTT

WELCH, JAMES M

WELCH, WANDA L

NORVELL, ANNA L

SWIFT, STEVE

10 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

CONLEY, CHRISTOPHER B.

COLEMAN, JACOB

 

Court Documents

ORDER TO DISMISS

07/11/2022: ORDER TO DISMISS

MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT

07/11/2022: MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

07/07/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

MOTION TO NON SUIT

07/07/2022: MOTION TO NON SUIT

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

06/06/2022: PROOF OF PUBLICATION

ANSWER FILED

05/27/2022: ANSWER FILED

WARNING ORDER IN REM

04/28/2022: WARNING ORDER IN REM

ORDER TO DISMISS

04/28/2022: ORDER TO DISMISS

AFF FOR WARN ORD SUBM W ORDER

04/26/2022: AFF FOR WARN ORD SUBM W ORDER

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

04/26/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

MOTION TO NON SUIT

04/26/2022: MOTION TO NON SUIT

LETTER

03/23/2022: LETTER

SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

01/13/2022: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

01/13/2022: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

01/13/2022: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

01/13/2022: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

01/13/2022: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

01/13/2022: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER TO DISMISS; Name: 20TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 1,; Entry: ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO SPECIFIC DEFENDANT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT; Name: CONLEY, CHRISTOPHER B.; Entry: MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND DECREE OF FORECLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Name: CONLEY, CHRISTOPHER B.; Entry: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - BY PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION TO NON SUIT; Name: CONLEY, CHRISTOPHER B.; Entry: MOTION FOR VOLUNTARY NONSUIT/DISMISSAL AS TO SPECIFIC DEFENDANT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: PROOF OF PUBLICATION; Name: CONLEY, CHRISTOPHER B.; Entry: AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER FILED; Entry: ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: WARNING ORDER IN REM; Entry: WARNING ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER TO DISMISS; Name: 20TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 1,; Entry: ORDER TO DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFF FOR WARN ORD SUBM W ORDER; Name: CONLEY, CHRISTOPHER B.; Entry: AFFIDAVIT FOR WARNING ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Name: CONLEY, CHRISTOPHER B.; Entry: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
54 More Docket Entries
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: CONLEY, CHRISTOPHER B.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: CONLEY, CHRISTOPHER B.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: CONLEY, CHRISTOPHER B.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: CONLEY, CHRISTOPHER B.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: CONLEY, CHRISTOPHER B.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: CONLEY, CHRISTOPHER B.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: CONLEY, CHRISTOPHER B.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: CONLEY, CHRISTOPHER B.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: CONLEY, CHRISTOPHER B.; Entry: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL; Name: CONLEY, CHRISTOPHER B.; Entry: COVERSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less