This case was last updated from Benton County Arkansas Courts on 01/29/2023 at 17:17:48 (UTC).

MOORE V MOORE -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 09/15/2022 MOORE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MOORE -NON-TRIAL. This case was filed in Benton County Arkansas Courts, Benton County Circuit Court located in Nevada, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is DUNCAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1484

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Benton, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

DUNCAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MOORE, MARCIA

Defendant

MOORE, LARRY DEAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEISTER, JOSHUA R.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

09/15/2022: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

09/16/2022: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

ORDER TRANSFER

09/21/2022: ORDER TRANSFER

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND WAIVER

09/22/2022: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND WAIVER

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE

09/28/2022: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE

ANSWER FILED

10/18/2022: ANSWER FILED

NOTICE HEARING SCHEDULED

10/25/2022: NOTICE HEARING SCHEDULED

NOTICE - OTHER

10/28/2022: NOTICE - OTHER

CERTIFICATE

10/31/2022: CERTIFICATE

MOTION WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL

11/07/2022: MOTION WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL

MOTION WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL

11/15/2022: MOTION WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL

ORDER TO WITHDRAW

11/22/2022: ORDER TO WITHDRAW

AFFIDAVIT OF FINANCIAL MEANS

01/10/2023: AFFIDAVIT OF FINANCIAL MEANS

CERTIFICATE

01/10/2023: CERTIFICATE

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: CERTIFICATE; Name: MEISTER, JOSHUA R.; Entry: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE PLF ANSWER TO DEF INTEROGATORIES AND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION SERVED ON DEF ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF FINANCIAL MEANS; Name: MEISTER, JOSHUA R.; Entry: AFFIDAVIT OF FINANCIAL MEANS FOR MARCIA MOORE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER TO WITHDRAW; Name: 19TH WEST CIRCUIT DIVISION 5,; Entry: JENAE RANDALL WITHDRAWN AS COUNSEL FOR DEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL; Name: RANDALL, JENAE LOUISE; Entry: AMENDED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL; Name: RANDALL, JENAE LOUISE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: CERTIFICATE; Name: MEISTER, JOSHUA R.; Entry: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE LARRY DEAN MOORE 10/31/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE - OTHER; Name: RANDALL, JENAE LOUISE; Entry: NOTICE OF FILING OF INTERROGATORIES PROPOUNDED TO DEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE HEARING SCHEDULED; Entry: HEARING SET ON 2/9/2023 AT 1:30 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER FILED; Name: RANDALL, JENAE LOUISE; Entry: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR DIVORCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE; Name: RANDALL, JENAE LOUISE; Entry: JENAE RANDALL AS ATTY FOR DEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND WAIVER; Name: MEISTER, JOSHUA R.; Entry: PRO SE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER TRANSFER; Name: 19TH WEST CIRCUIT DIVISION 6,; Entry: FROM DIV 6 TO DIV 5

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED; Entry: LARRY MOORE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $167.50 was made on receipt 04CI82445.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: MEISTER, JOSHUA R.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: MEISTER, JOSHUA R.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: MEISTER, JOSHUA R.; Entry: COMPLAINT FOR DIVORCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET DOMESTIC REL; Name: MEISTER, JOSHUA R.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less