This case was last updated from Faulkner County Courts on 04/30/2022 at 14:21:13 (UTC).

MID-SOUTH ADJUSTMENT VS KRISTINA TEAGUE

Case Summary

On 07/27/2021 MID-SOUTH ADJUSTMENT filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against KRISTINA TEAGUE. This case was filed in Faulkner County Courts, Faulkner County District Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is CLAWSON, CHARLES. The case status is Pending - Trial.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-721

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Trial

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Faulkner, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

CLAWSON, CHARLES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MID-SOUTH ADJUSTMENT

Defendant

TEAGUE, KRISTINA

Garnishee

DEPARTMENT OF FINANCE & ADMINISTRATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DOWLER, BRADLEY G

 

Court Documents

CV COMPLAINT FILED $

07/27/2021: CV COMPLAINT FILED $

CV COMPLAINT FILED $

07/27/2021: CV COMPLAINT FILED $

SUMMONS - PROCESS SERVER

08/27/2021: SUMMONS - PROCESS SERVER

MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT

09/22/2021: MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT-DEFAULT

09/24/2021: JUDGMENT-DEFAULT

WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED

11/04/2021: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ADMITTED GARNISHMENT; Name: MID-SOUTH ADJUSTMENT,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of -$10.00 was made on receipt 23CW71649.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED; Name: DEPARTMENT OF FINANCE & ADMINISTRATION,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: JUDGMENT-DEFAULT; Name: MID-SOUTH ADJUSTMENT,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT; Name: MID-SOUTH ADJUSTMENT,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of -$45.00 was made on receipt 23CW70701.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS - PROCESS SERVER; Name: MID-SOUTH ADJUSTMENT,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: SERVICE (IN STATE); Name: TEAGUE, KRISTINA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of -$80.00 was made on receipt 23CW70310.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED; Name: MID-SOUTH ADJUSTMENT,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: CV COMPLAINT FILED $; Name: MID-SOUTH ADJUSTMENT,

    Read MoreRead Less