This case was last updated from Faulkner County Courts on 04/30/2022 at 06:45:20 (UTC).

MID SOUTH ADJUSTMENT CO VS JAMIE IRVIN

Case Summary

On 06/21/2021 MID SOUTH ADJUSTMENT CO filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JAMIE IRVIN. This case was filed in Faulkner County Courts, Faulkner County District Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is CARNAHAN, CHRIS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-607

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Faulkner, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

CARNAHAN, CHRIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MID SOUTH ADJUSTMENT CO

Defendant

IRVIN, JAMIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DOWLER, BRADLEY G

 

Court Documents

CV COMPLAINT FILED $

06/21/2021: CV COMPLAINT FILED $

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/21/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED

ANSWER ADMITTING CLAIM

06/29/2021: ANSWER ADMITTING CLAIM

SERVICE (IN STATE)

07/19/2021: SERVICE (IN STATE)

MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT

08/27/2021: MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT-DEFAULT

08/30/2021: JUDGMENT-DEFAULT

SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED

10/22/2021: SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED; Name: MID SOUTH ADJUSTMENT CO,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: JUDGMENT-DEFAULT; Name: MID SOUTH ADJUSTMENT CO,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT; Name: MID SOUTH ADJUSTMENT CO,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of -$45.00 was made on receipt 23CW70436.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS - PROCESS SERVER; Name: MID SOUTH ADJUSTMENT CO,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SERVICE (IN STATE); Name: IRVIN, JAMIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ADMITTING CLAIM; Name: IRVIN, JAMIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of -$80.00 was made on receipt 23CW69919.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED; Name: MID SOUTH ADJUSTMENT CO,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: CV COMPLAINT FILED $; Name: MID SOUTH ADJUSTMENT CO,

    Read MoreRead Less