This case was last updated from Crawford County Courts on 05/12/2022 at 00:23:27 (UTC).

MID-SOUTH ADJUSTMENT CO. V CAITLYNN BELL

Case Summary

On 01/11/2021 MID-SOUTH ADJUSTMENT CO filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CAITLYNN BELL. This case was filed in Crawford County Courts, Crawford County District Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The case status is Pending - Trial.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1-28

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Trial

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Crawford, Arkansas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MID SOUTH ADJUSTMENT

Defendant

BELL, CAITLYNN

Garnishee

CRAWFORD HEALTH AND REHAB

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DOWLER, BRADLEY G

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT RECEIVED

01/21/2021: PAYMENT RECEIVED

SUMMONS SERVED

02/25/2021: SUMMONS SERVED

JUDGMENT-DEFAULT

03/18/2021: JUDGMENT-DEFAULT

WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED

06/30/2021: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

08/16/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

ANSWER FROM GARNISHEE

09/14/2021: ANSWER FROM GARNISHEE

ORDER GARNISHMENT

09/20/2021: ORDER GARNISHMENT

SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED

12/17/2021: SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED

ORDER GARNISHMENT RELEASED

12/27/2021: ORDER GARNISHMENT RELEASED

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER GARNISHMENT RELEASED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER GARNISHMENT; Entry: JUDGE BAKER SIGNED ORDER TO THE GARNISHEE - ARKANSAS HMA RAGIONAL SERVICE CENTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER FROM GARNISHEE; Entry: ALLEGATIONS AND INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of -$10.00 was made on receipt 17VA117146.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED; Name: MID SOUTH ADJUSTMENT,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: JUDGMENT-DEFAULT; Entry: JUDGE BAKER APPROVED DEFAULT JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF $971.79, ATTORNEY FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $320.69, CURRENT COURT COST IN THE AMOUNT OF $130.00 AND ALL FUTURE COURT COST, PLUS INTEREST AT THE RATE OF 2.25% PER ANNUM. DEFENDANT SHALL WITHIN 45 DAYS OF THE RECEIPT OF THIS JUDGMENT FILE A SCHEDULE VERIFIED BY AFFIDAVIT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS SERVED; Name: MID SOUTH ADJUSTMENT,; Entry: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT SERVED TO DEFENDANT ON 2-3-2021 BY PROCESS SERVER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of -$80.00 was made on receipt 17VA111562.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: CV COMPLAINT FILED $; Name: MID SOUTH ADJUSTMENT,

    Read MoreRead Less