This case was last updated from Pulaski County Courts on 02/27/2022 at 08:13:05 (UTC).

MID CRED MNGMNT INC V YEARIAN

Case Summary

On 06/30/2021 MID CRED MNGMNT INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against YEARIAN. This case was filed in Pulaski County Courts, Pulaski County District Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is GRUBER, W. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-844

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Pulaski, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

GRUBER, W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC

Defendant

YEARIAN, ROBERT E

North Little Rock, AR 72118-4136

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AIKEN, KEITH A

 

Court Documents

CV COMPLAINT FILED $

06/30/2021: CV COMPLAINT FILED $

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/30/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS - PROCESS SERVER

08/17/2021: SUMMONS - PROCESS SERVER

MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT

09/27/2021: MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT-DEFAULT

10/04/2021: JUDGMENT-DEFAULT

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: JUDGMENT-DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS - PROCESS SERVER; Entry: ROBERT YEARIAN SERVED ON 8-04-2021 PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of -$82.50 was made on receipt 60PC184303.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED; Name: MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: DATE CLAIM AROSE; Name: MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: CV COMPLAINT FILED $; Name: MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC,

    Read MoreRead Less