This case was last updated from Baxter County Courts on 02/22/2022 at 01:07:42 (UTC).

MICHELLE COX V DANIEL COX -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 03/04/2021 MICHELLE COX filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against DANIEL COX -NON-TRIAL. This case was filed in Baxter County Courts, Baxter County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is COPELAND. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1-68

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Baxter, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

COPELAND

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COX, MICHELLE

Defendant

COX, DANIEL K

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED

03/04/2021: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED

AFFIDAVIT IN FORMA PAUPERIS

03/04/2021: AFFIDAVIT IN FORMA PAUPERIS

IFP EXHIBIT NO FILE MARK

03/04/2021: IFP EXHIBIT NO FILE MARK

ORDER PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPER

03/04/2021: ORDER PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPER

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED

03/05/2021: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/08/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED

RETURN OF SERVICE

06/11/2021: RETURN OF SERVICE

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND WAIVER

06/21/2021: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND WAIVER

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: JUDGE NOTE; Entry: PLAINTIFF LEFT A MESSAGE THAT SHE WISHED TO CANCEL THE HEARING AND DID NOT APPEAR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: UNCONTEST DIVRCE HEARING CANC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: UNCONTEST DIVRCE HEARING SCHED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: UNCONTEST DIVRCE HEARING CONTD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: JUDGE NOTE; Entry: CASE CONTINUED AT THE REQUEST OF THE PLAINTIFF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: UNCONTEST DIVRCE HEARING SCHED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: UNCONTEST DIVRCE HEARING CONTD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: UNCONTEST DIVRCE HEARING SCHED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: JUDGE NOTE; Entry: PARTIES DID NOT APPEAR FOR HEARING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: UNCONTEST DIVRCE HEARING CANC

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: UNCONTEST DIVRCE HEARING SCHED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: RETURN OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED; Entry: DANIEL K COX

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED; Entry: COMPLAINT FOR DIVORCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPER; Name: 14TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 4,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: IFP EXHIBIT NO FILE MARK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT IN FORMA PAUPERIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET DOMESTIC REL

    Read MoreRead Less