This case was last updated from Washington County Courts on 05/29/2022 at 07:10:08 (UTC).

MICHAEL P. YOUNG -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 03/08/2021 MICHAEL P YOUNG -NON-TRIAL was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Washington County Courts, Washington County District Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is TAYLOR. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-207

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Washington, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

TAYLOR

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified

YOUNG, CHRISTY

Decedent

YOUNG, MICHAEL P.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

WESTPHAL, MARY ANN

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

03/08/2021: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

WAIVER

03/08/2021: WAIVER

WAIVER

03/19/2021: WAIVER

WAIVER

03/19/2021: WAIVER

ORDER APPOINT PERS REPRESENT

03/19/2021: ORDER APPOINT PERS REPRESENT

ACCEPT APPOINTMENT

03/22/2021: ACCEPT APPOINTMENT

LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

03/22/2021: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

04/08/2021: PROOF OF PUBLICATION

NOTICE AFF CLAIM AGAINST ESTAT

04/19/2021: NOTICE AFF CLAIM AGAINST ESTAT

PET AUTH MAKE FINAL DISTRIB

12/23/2021: PET AUTH MAKE FINAL DISTRIB

RECEIPT/RELEASE BY DISTRIBUTEE

01/05/2022: RECEIPT/RELEASE BY DISTRIBUTEE

ORDER AUTH FINAL DISTRIBUTION

01/06/2022: ORDER AUTH FINAL DISTRIBUTION

RECEIPT/RELEASE BY DISTRIBUTEE

02/10/2022: RECEIPT/RELEASE BY DISTRIBUTEE

RECEIPT/RELEASE BY DISTRIBUTEE

02/10/2022: RECEIPT/RELEASE BY DISTRIBUTEE

RECEIPT/RELEASE BY DISTRIBUTEE

02/16/2022: RECEIPT/RELEASE BY DISTRIBUTEE

REPORT OF FINAL DISTRIBUTION

03/22/2022: REPORT OF FINAL DISTRIBUTION

ORDER CLOSING ESTATE

03/23/2022: ORDER CLOSING ESTATE

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER CLOSING ESTATE; Name: 4TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 7,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC DISPOSITION SHEET; Name: WESTPHAL, MARY ANN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: REPORT OF FINAL DISTRIBUTION; Name: WESTPHAL, MARY ANN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: RECEIPT/RELEASE BY DISTRIBUTEE; Name: WESTPHAL, MARY ANN; Entry: Michael Young Estate Receipt of Distributee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: RECEIPT/RELEASE BY DISTRIBUTEE; Name: WESTPHAL, MARY ANN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: RECEIPT/RELEASE BY DISTRIBUTEE; Name: WESTPHAL, MARY ANN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER; Entry: TRIAL TYPE: N

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER AUTH FINAL DISTRIBUTION; Name: 4TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 7,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: RECEIPT/RELEASE BY DISTRIBUTEE

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ACCEPT APPOINTMENT; Name: WESTPHAL, MARY ANN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER APPOINT PERS REPRESENT; Name: 4TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 7,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: WAIVER; Name: WESTPHAL, MARY ANN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: WAIVER; Name: WESTPHAL, MARY ANN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $165.00 was made on receipt 72CO3302.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: WESTPHAL, MARY ANN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: WAIVER; Name: WESTPHAL, MARY ANN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: DEATH CERTIFICATE; Name: WESTPHAL, MARY ANN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: WESTPHAL, MARY ANN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET PROBATE; Name: WESTPHAL, MARY ANN

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WESTPHAL, MARY ANN