This case was last updated from Van Buren County Courts on 05/06/2022 at 06:03:52 (UTC).

MELINDA TANKERSLEY V DANIEL A MCMULLIN -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 04/05/2021 MELINDA TANKERSLEY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DANIEL A MCMULLIN -NON-TRIAL. This case was filed in Van Buren County Courts, Van Buren County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is WEAVER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1-49

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Van Buren, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

WEAVER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TANKERSLEY, MELINDA

Defendants

MCMULLIN, DANIEL ALVIN

MCMULLIN, DANIEL ALVIN,JR

LANDERS AUTO SALES, LLC

ULTIMATE SHINE AUTOMOBILE DETAILING, LLC

LANDERS AUTO GROUP LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, LLLP

LANDERS CORP., INC.

THOMSON, ZACHARY LAINE

SJL AUTO GROUP NO. 1, LLC

Decedent

LONGEST, JOY ANNE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GIBSON, JESSE JOE

Defendant Attorneys

JONES, JAMIE HUFFMAN

BRICK JR., PHILLIP MEYER

WOOTEN, TODD

WOOTEN, ROGER TODD

 

Court Documents

NOTICE - OTHER

01/15/2022: NOTICE - OTHER

LETTER TO COURT

01/11/2022: LETTER TO COURT

MOTION SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL

01/11/2022: MOTION SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL

ORDER TO DISMISS

12/06/2021: ORDER TO DISMISS

MOTION DISMISS

12/03/2021: MOTION DISMISS

ANSWER FILED

11/24/2021: ANSWER FILED

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

11/02/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

ORDER EXTENSION OF TIME

10/29/2021: ORDER EXTENSION OF TIME

MOTION EXTENSION OF TIME

10/28/2021: MOTION EXTENSION OF TIME

ORDER TO DISMISS

10/26/2021: ORDER TO DISMISS

FILING - OTHER

10/26/2021: FILING - OTHER

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE

10/26/2021: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE

ANSWER FILED

10/26/2021: ANSWER FILED

ANSWER FILED

10/26/2021: ANSWER FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/18/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/18/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED

EXHIBITS

10/18/2021: EXHIBITS

EXHIBITS

10/18/2021: EXHIBITS

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE - OTHER; Name: WOOTEN, ROGER TODD; Entry: Notice of Change of Firm and Contact Information (Todd Wooten)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: LETTER TO COURT; Name: WOOTEN, ROGER TODD; Entry: Letter to Judge Weaver regarding Motion and proposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL; Name: WOOTEN, ROGER TODD; Entry: Motion for Substitution of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER TO DISMISS; Name: 20TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 1,; Entry: ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF SEPARATE DEFENDANT LANDERS AUTO SALES, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION DISMISS; Name: GIBSON, JESSE JOE; Entry: PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF SEPARATE DEFENDANT LANDERS AUTO SALES, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER FILED; Name: WOOTEN, ROGER TODD; Entry: SEPARATE DEFENDANT, SJL AUTO GROUP N01, ANSWER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Name: GIBSON, JESSE JOE; Entry: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER EXTENSION OF TIME; Name: 20TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 1,; Entry: ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO SEPARATE DEFENDANT LANDERS AUTO SALES, LLC TO FILE A RESPONSIVE PLEADING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION EXTENSION OF TIME; Name: BRICK JR., PHILLIP MEYER; Entry: SEPARATE DEFENDANT LANDERS AUTO SALES, LLCS SECOND UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE A RESPONSIVE PLEADING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER TO DISMISS; Name: 20TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 1,; Entry: ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED; Entry: SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED; Name: GIBSON, JESSE JOE; Entry: SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $2.50 was made on receipt 71CI3305.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: GIBSON, JESSE JOE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED; Name: GIBSON, JESSE JOE; Entry: SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $165.00 was made on receipt 71CI3304.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: GIBSON, JESSE JOE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: EXHIBITS; Name: GIBSON, JESSE JOE; Entry: EXHIBITS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: GIBSON, JESSE JOE; Entry: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL; Name: GIBSON, JESSE JOE; Entry: COVERSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less