This case was last updated from Pulaski County Courts on 03/05/2022 at 13:21:04 (UTC).

MEENU SHARMA V GLOBAL TEACHERS SOLUTIONS LLC ET AL -JURY TRIAL

Case Summary

On 12/09/2020 MEENU SHARMA filed an Other lawsuit against GLOBAL TEACHERS SOLUTIONS LLC -JURY TRIAL. This case was filed in Pulaski County Courts, Pulaski County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is HON. ALICE S. GRAY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6980

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Pulaski, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

HON. ALICE S. GRAY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHARMA, MEENU

Defendants

GLOBAL TEACHERS SOLUTIONS LLC

GOVINDARAJULU, PRABHU

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HONAKER, BEN

Defendant Attorney

PIAZZA, HENRY SAMUEL

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

12/09/2020: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

FILING - OTHER

12/09/2020: FILING - OTHER

AMENDED COMPLAINT

12/09/2020: AMENDED COMPLAINT

SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

12/11/2020: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

12/11/2020: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

RETURN SERVICE NON EST INVENT

02/12/2021: RETURN SERVICE NON EST INVENT

ANSWER FILED

03/02/2021: ANSWER FILED

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

08/19/2021: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF DEPOSITION

09/02/2021: NOTICE OF DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF DEPOSITION

09/02/2021: NOTICE OF DEPOSITION

SUBPOENA SERVED

09/09/2021: SUBPOENA SERVED

RESPONSE TO REQ FOR ADMISSIONS

09/17/2021: RESPONSE TO REQ FOR ADMISSIONS

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: RESPONSE TO REQ FOR ADMISSIONS; Name: PIAZZA, HENRY SAMUEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUBPOENA SERVED; Name: HONAKER, BEN; Entry: 9-7-21 GLOBAL TEACHERS SOLUTIONS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE OF DEPOSITION; Name: HONAKER, BEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE OF DEPOSITION; Name: HONAKER, BEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Name: HONAKER, BEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: EFILING NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Name: PIAZZA, HENRY SAMUEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER FILED; Name: PIAZZA, HENRY SAMUEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: RETURN SERVICE NON EST INVENT; Name: HONAKER, BEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $5.00 was made on receipt 60CI415658.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: HONAKER, BEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: HONAKER, BEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AMENDED COMPLAINT; Name: HONAKER, BEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $165.00 was made on receipt 60CI415639.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: HONAKER, BEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: FILING - OTHER; Name: HONAKER, BEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: HONAKER, BEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL; Name: HONAKER, BEN

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PIAZZA, HENRY SAMUEL