This case was last updated from Benton County Arkansas Courts on 07/30/2022 at 11:12:32 (UTC).

MARY MERCER -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 01/21/2022 MARY MERCER -NON-TRIAL was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Benton County Arkansas Courts, Benton County District Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judges overseeing this case are SCHRANTZ and SCOTT, JOHN R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2-67

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Benton, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judges

SCHRANTZ

SCOTT, JOHN R

 

Party Details

Claimants

WELNETZ, FRANCIS P,JR

WELNETZ, FRANCIS P

Not Yet Classified and Administrator

ARVEST BANK

Decedent

MERCER, MARY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

ZAHAROPOULOS, JOHN ROBERT

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

01/21/2022: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT

01/21/2022: LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT

ORDER TRANSFER

01/25/2022: ORDER TRANSFER

ORDER APPT ADMINISTRATOR/IX

02/22/2022: ORDER APPT ADMINISTRATOR/IX

ACCEPT APPT PERSONAL REP

02/23/2022: ACCEPT APPT PERSONAL REP

LETTERS TESTAMENTARY

02/23/2022: LETTERS TESTAMENTARY

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

03/17/2022: PROOF OF PUBLICATION

AFFIDAVIT CLAIM AGAINST ESTATE

05/09/2022: AFFIDAVIT CLAIM AGAINST ESTATE

NOTICE AFF CLAIM AGAINST ESTAT

05/09/2022: NOTICE AFF CLAIM AGAINST ESTAT

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE AFF CLAIM AGAINST ESTAT; Entry: NOTICE OF CLAIM - WELNETZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of -$5.00 was made on receipt 04CO9137.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT CLAIM AGAINST ESTATE; Entry: CLAIM VS ESTATE - WELNETZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: PROOF OF PUBLICATION; Name: ZAHAROPOULOS, JOHN ROBERT; Entry: Affidavit of Publication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: LETTERS TESTAMENTARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ACCEPT APPT PERSONAL REP; Name: ZAHAROPOULOS, JOHN ROBERT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER APPT ADMINISTRATOR/IX; Name: 19TH WEST CIRCUIT DIVISION 4,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER TRANSFER; Name: 19TH WEST CIRCUIT DIVISION 6,; Entry: D06 TO D04

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $165.00 was made on receipt 04CO8561.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: ZAHAROPOULOS, JOHN ROBERT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT; Name: ZAHAROPOULOS, JOHN ROBERT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: ZAHAROPOULOS, JOHN ROBERT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET PROBATE; Name: ZAHAROPOULOS, JOHN ROBERT

    Read MoreRead Less