This case was last updated from Crawford County Courts on 05/18/2022 at 17:20:55 (UTC).

MARTHA SISK -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 10/30/2021 MARTHA SISK -NON-TRIAL was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Crawford County Courts, Crawford County District Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is MIKE MEDLOCK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-321

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Crawford, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

MIKE MEDLOCK

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BEAKLEY, SHARLA

Claimant

ADHS-THIRD PARTY LIABILITY UNIT

Decedent

SISK, MARTHA LOU

Not Yet Classified

SISK, EDDIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

CAMPBELL, HOWARD GREGORY

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

10/30/2021: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

WAIVER INVENTORY/ACCOUNTING

10/30/2021: WAIVER INVENTORY/ACCOUNTING

ORDER APPOINT PERS REPRESENT

11/01/2021: ORDER APPOINT PERS REPRESENT

ACCEPT APPT PERSONAL REP

11/01/2021: ACCEPT APPT PERSONAL REP

PETITION

11/01/2021: PETITION

ORDER PETITION GRANTED

11/02/2021: ORDER PETITION GRANTED

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

11/18/2021: PROOF OF PUBLICATION

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

11/29/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIDAVIT CLAIM AGAINST ESTATE

01/31/2022: AFFIDAVIT CLAIM AGAINST ESTATE

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of -$5.00 was made on receipt 17CO2321.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT CLAIM AGAINST ESTATE; Name: ADHS-THIRD PARTY LIABILITY UNIT,; Entry: CLAIMANT: DHS MEDICAID THIRD PARTY LIABILITY UNIT, AMOUNT $78,329.85

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $165.00 was made on receipt 17CO2283.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Name: CAMPBELL, HOWARD GREGORY; Entry: LETTER, NOTICE OF PUBLICATION & PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT TO DHS BY CERT MAIL SIGNED BY BRANDON ADAMSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: PROOF OF PUBLICATION; Name: CAMPBELL, HOWARD GREGORY; Entry: NOTICE OF APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND FILING OF CLAIMS IN TIMES RECORD ON 11/04/2021 & 11/11/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER PETITION GRANTED; Name: JUDGE MIKE MEDLOCK,; Entry: REDDICK MOSS, PLLC AND RAINWATER, HOLT & SEXTON P.A. IS HEREBY APPROVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: PETITION; Name: CAMPBELL, HOWARD GREGORY; Entry: FOR APPROVAL OF CONTRACT, SIGNED BY SHARLA BEAKLEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ACCEPT APPT PERSONAL REP; Name: CAMPBELL, HOWARD GREGORY; Entry: SIGNED BY SHARLA BEAKLEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER APPOINT PERS REPRESENT; Name: JUDGE MIKE MEDLOCK,; Entry: SHARLA BEAKLEY IS APPOINTED PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE TO SERVE WITHOUT BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: CAMPBELL, HOWARD GREGORY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: WAIVER INVENTORY/ACCOUNTING; Name: CAMPBELL, HOWARD GREGORY; Entry: WAIVER OF NOTICE, BOND, ACCOUNTING, INVENTORY, AND ENTRY OF APPEARANCE, SIGNED BY SHARLA BEAKLEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: CAMPBELL, HOWARD GREGORY; Entry: FOR APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, SIGNED BY SHARLA BEAKLEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET PROBATE; Name: CAMPBELL, HOWARD GREGORY

    Read MoreRead Less