This case was last updated from Pulaski County Courts on 01/13/2023 at 09:04:08 (UTC).

MARK MIDDLETON -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 05/12/2022 MARK MIDDLETON -NON-TRIAL was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Pulaski County Courts, Pulaski County Circuit Court located in Conway, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is HON. AMY D. JOHNSON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1032

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Pulaski, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

HON. AMY D. JOHNSON

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified

MIDDLETON, LAUREN CHANDLER

MIDDLETON, LINDSAY MADISON

MIDDLETON, RHEA

MIDDLETON, LARRY

REVOCABLE TRUST, MARK MIDDLETON

Decedent

MIDDLETON, MARK

Executors and Not Yet Classified

MIDDLETON, RHEA

MIDDLETON, LARRY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

PARNELL, JAMES PAUL

 

Court Documents

AMENDED PETITION

05/13/2022: AMENDED PETITION

ORDER APPOINT PERS REPRESENT

05/16/2022: ORDER APPOINT PERS REPRESENT

ACCEPT APPT PERSONAL REP

05/16/2022: ACCEPT APPT PERSONAL REP

ACCEPT APPT PERSONAL REP

05/16/2022: ACCEPT APPT PERSONAL REP

LETTERS TESTAMENTARY

05/16/2022: LETTERS TESTAMENTARY

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

06/15/2022: PROOF OF PUBLICATION

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $5.00 was made on receipt 60CI466532.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: REQUEST CERTIFIED COPY; Name: PARNELL, JAMES PAUL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: PROOF OF PUBLICATION; Name: PARNELL, JAMES PAUL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: CLERK NOTE; Entry: LETTER MAILED TO ATTORNEY - SHAMKIA PATRICK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: LETTERS TESTAMENTARY; Entry: CO-EXECUTOR/EXECUTRIX

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ACCEPT APPT PERSONAL REP; Name: PARNELL, JAMES PAUL; Entry: RHEA MIDDLETON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ACCEPT APPT PERSONAL REP; Name: PARNELL, JAMES PAUL; Entry: LARRY MIDDLETON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER APPOINT PERS REPRESENT; Name: HON. AMY D. JOHNSON - 15TH DIVISION 6TH CIRCUIT,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AMENDED PETITION; Name: PARNELL, JAMES PAUL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $165.00 was made on receipt 60CI453619.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: PARNELL, JAMES PAUL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT; Name: PARNELL, JAMES PAUL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: PARNELL, JAMES PAUL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET PROBATE; Name: PARNELL, JAMES PAUL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less