This case was last updated from Columbia County Courts on 12/22/2022 at 14:03:32 (UTC).

MARILYN JAN KING WILCHER

Case Summary

On 01/27/2022 MARILYN JAN KING WILCHER was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Columbia County Courts, Columbia County District Court located in Conway, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is TALLEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****22-6

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

TALLEY

 

Party Details

Petitioner

RHODES, KENNETH

Decedent

WILCHER, KING MARILYN JAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

HUTCHESON, JOEL ISSAC

 

Court Documents

ORDER OTHER

02/08/2022: ORDER OTHER

AFFIDAVIT CLAIM AGAINST ESTATE

02/16/2022: AFFIDAVIT CLAIM AGAINST ESTATE

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

03/07/2022: PROOF OF PUBLICATION

RELEASE OF LIEN

04/21/2022: RELEASE OF LIEN

FILING - OTHER

08/23/2022: FILING - OTHER

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: FILING - OTHER; Name: HUTCHESON, JOEL ISSAC; Entry: Certification of Claims Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: RELEASE OF LIEN; Entry: RECEIPT AND RELEASE OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: PROOF OF PUBLICATION; Name: HUTCHESON, JOEL ISSAC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT CLAIM AGAINST ESTATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER OTHER; Entry: ORDER ADMITTING WILL OF NONRESIDENT TO PROBATE WITHOUT ADMINSTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: PETITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET PROBATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less