This case was last updated from Benton County Courts on 05/03/2022 at 14:54:36 (UTC).

MARGIE FARLEY -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 11/04/2021 MARGIE FARLEY -NON-TRIAL was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Benton County Courts, Benton County District Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is SCHRANTZ. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1126

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Benton, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

SCHRANTZ

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CRAWFORD, LESLIE

Not Yet Classified

FARLEY, MARGIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

ADKINS, JOHN MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

STATEMENT OF RIGHTS

11/04/2021: STATEMENT OF RIGHTS

PETITION CIVIL COMMITMENT

11/04/2021: PETITION CIVIL COMMITMENT

ORDER PICK UP ORDER

11/04/2021: ORDER PICK UP ORDER

ORDER MENTAL EXAMINATION

11/08/2021: ORDER MENTAL EXAMINATION

JUDGE NOTE

11/10/2021: JUDGE NOTE

ORDER TO DISMISS

12/13/2021: ORDER TO DISMISS

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER; Entry: TRIAL TYPE: N

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC DISPOSITION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER TO DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: JUDGE NOTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER MENTAL EXAMINATION; Entry: 7 DAY EVAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER PICK UP ORDER; Entry: IMMEDIATE DETENTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: ADKINS, JOHN MICHAEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: PETITION CIVIL COMMITMENT; Name: ADKINS, JOHN MICHAEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: STATEMENT OF RIGHTS; Name: ADKINS, JOHN MICHAEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET PROBATE; Name: ADKINS, JOHN MICHAEL

    Read MoreRead Less