This case was last updated from Benton County Courts on 05/23/2022 at 13:27:23 (UTC).

MARGARET ELA HOPKINS -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 06/15/2021 MARGARET ELA HOPKINS -NON-TRIAL was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Benton County Courts, Benton County District Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is HORWART. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-608

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Benton, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

HORWART

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MATTHEWS, MYRON

Claimant

FORTE LLC, ALEGIS GROUP

Decedent

HOPKINS, MARGARET E

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BRADY JR , DONALD ADRIAN

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

05/11/2022: PROOF OF PUBLICATION

SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED

05/06/2022: SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED

PET AUTH MAKE FINAL DISTRIB

04/27/2022: PET AUTH MAKE FINAL DISTRIB

MOTION OTHER

04/20/2022: MOTION OTHER

ACCOUNTING BY PERSONAL REP$

04/20/2022: ACCOUNTING BY PERSONAL REP$

NOTICE HEARING SCHEDULED

04/20/2022: NOTICE HEARING SCHEDULED

ORDER CONFIRMING SALE

04/04/2022: ORDER CONFIRMING SALE

PETITION

04/02/2022: PETITION

PETITION

04/02/2022: PETITION

AFFIDAVIT CLAIM AGAINST ESTATE

04/02/2022: AFFIDAVIT CLAIM AGAINST ESTATE

REPORT OF SALE

04/02/2022: REPORT OF SALE

REPORT OF SALE

04/02/2022: REPORT OF SALE

AFFIDAVIT CLAIM AGAINST ESTATE

03/28/2022: AFFIDAVIT CLAIM AGAINST ESTATE

ORDER OTHER

02/14/2022: ORDER OTHER

APPRAISAL

02/14/2022: APPRAISAL

PETITION

01/31/2022: PETITION

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

09/08/2021: PROOF OF PUBLICATION

LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

08/16/2021: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: PROOF OF PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED; Entry: RELEASE OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: PET AUTH MAKE FINAL DISTRIB; Name: BRADY JR , DONALD ADRIAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $50.00 was made on receipt 04CO9030.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION OTHER; Name: BRADY JR , DONALD ADRIAN; Entry: Motion to Disallow Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ACCOUNTING BY PERSONAL REP$; Name: BRADY JR , DONALD ADRIAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE HEARING SCHEDULED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER CONFIRMING SALE; Name: 19TH WEST CIRCUIT DIVISION 7,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: PETITION; Name: BRADY JR , DONALD ADRIAN; Entry: for allowance of claims

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: PETITION; Name: BRADY JR , DONALD ADRIAN; Entry: for allowance of fees

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ACCEPT APPT PERSONAL REP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER APPOINT PERS REPRESENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE HEARING SCHEDULED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: WAIVER; Name: BRADY JR , DONALD ADRIAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $165.00 was made on receipt 04CO7481.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: BRADY JR , DONALD ADRIAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT; Name: BRADY JR , DONALD ADRIAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: DEATH CERTIFICATE; Name: BRADY JR , DONALD ADRIAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: BRADY JR , DONALD ADRIAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET PROBATE; Name: BRADY JR , DONALD ADRIAN

    Read MoreRead Less