This case was last updated from Washington County Courts on 01/29/2022 at 08:30:32 (UTC).

MAPLE MANOR APTS V SAMANTHA DUNSING -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 07/26/2021 MAPLE MANOR APTS filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against SAMANTHA DUNSING -NON-TRIAL. This case was filed in Washington County Courts, Washington County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is BRYAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1585

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Washington, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

BRYAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MAPLE MANOR APARTMENTS

Defendant

DUNSING, SAMANTHA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GIBBS, DARREN ALEXANDER

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

07/26/2021: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

07/26/2021: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

07/26/2021: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED

NOTICE - OTHER

07/26/2021: NOTICE - OTHER

AFFIDAVIT FILED

07/26/2021: AFFIDAVIT FILED

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

08/02/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

SUMMONS SERVED

08/02/2021: SUMMONS SERVED

MOTION OTHER

08/04/2021: MOTION OTHER

SUMMONS SERVED

08/04/2021: SUMMONS SERVED

ORDER WRIT

08/05/2021: ORDER WRIT

WRIT OF POSSESSION$

08/05/2021: WRIT OF POSSESSION$

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

08/12/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Entry: SAMANTHA DUNSING ON 08/10/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $20.00 was made on receipt 72CI76190.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: WRIT OF POSSESSION$; Name: GIBBS, DARREN ALEXANDER; Entry: WRIT OF POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER WRIT; Name: 4TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 5,; Entry: ORDER FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS SERVED; Name: GIBBS, DARREN ALEXANDER; Entry: AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION OTHER; Name: GIBBS, DARREN ALEXANDER; Entry: MOTION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS SERVED; Name: GIBBS, DARREN ALEXANDER; Entry: UNKNOWN RESIDENTS - NON EST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Name: GIBBS, DARREN ALEXANDER; Entry: SAMANTHA DUNSING - NON EST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT FILED; Name: GIBBS, DARREN ALEXANDER; Entry: AFFIDAVIT OF DARREN A GIBBS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $170.00 was made on receipt 72CI75735.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE - OTHER; Name: GIBBS, DARREN ALEXANDER; Entry: NOTICE OF INTENTION TO ISSUE WRIT OF POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED; Name: GIBBS, DARREN ALEXANDER; Entry: UNKNOWN RESIDENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED; Name: GIBBS, DARREN ALEXANDER; Entry: SAMANTHA DUNSING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: GIBBS, DARREN ALEXANDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: GIBBS, DARREN ALEXANDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: GIBBS, DARREN ALEXANDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: GIBBS, DARREN ALEXANDER; Entry: COMPLAINT IN UNLAWFUL DETAINER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL; Name: GIBBS, DARREN ALEXANDER

    Read MoreRead Less