This case was last updated from Pulaski County Courts on 04/23/2022 at 08:26:03 (UTC).

MAA ARKANSAS REIT, LLC V JONATHAN JARRETT -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 03/15/2021 MAA ARKANSAS REIT, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JONATHAN JARRETT -NON-TRIAL. This case was filed in Pulaski County Courts, Pulaski County District Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is LEVERETT. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-103

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Pulaski, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

LEVERETT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MAA ARKANSAS REIT, LLC

Defendant

JARRETT, JONATHAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JACKSON, JOY N

 

Court Documents

CV COMPLAINT FILED $

03/15/2021: CV COMPLAINT FILED $

SUMMONS ISSUED

03/15/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED

MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT

05/20/2021: MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT-DEFAULT

06/01/2021: JUDGMENT-DEFAULT

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of -$10.00 was made on receipt 60LR216352.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: CERTIFIED/AUTHENTICATED COPIES; Entry: The fee ACCP in the amount of 10.00 was added on CBAACCD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of -$10.00 was made on receipt 60LR208716.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: CERTIFIED/AUTHENTICATED COPIES; Entry: The fee ACCP in the amount of 10.00 was added on CBAACCD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: JUDGMENT-DEFAULT; Name: DISTRICT JUDGE OF LITTLE ROCK DISTRICT COURT 3RD DIVISION,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT; Name: JACKSON, JOY N

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS SERVED; Name: JACKSON, JOY N; Entry: SUBSTITUTE SERVICE: DELIVERED TO MARVIN JARRETT ON APRIL 5, 2021 AT 5:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $82.50 was made on receipt 60LR202180.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED; Name: JACKSON, JOY N; Entry: SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE DISTRICT 16-17-126; Name: JACKSON, JOY N; Entry: SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: CV COMPLAINT FILED $; Name: JACKSON, JOY N; Entry: COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF LEASE AGREEMENT EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: FILING - OTHER; Name: JACKSON, JOY N; Entry: CIVIL COVERSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less