This case was last updated from White County Courts on 01/26/2023 at 07:04:13 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING V MICHELLE HARKEY

Case Summary

On 05/27/2021 LVNV FUNDING filed an Other lawsuit against MICHELLE HARKEY. This case was filed in White County Courts, White County Circuit Court located in Nevada, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is PATE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-305

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    White, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

PATE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LVNV FUNDING LLC

ARVEST BANK

Defendant

HARKEY, MICHELLE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MUELLER, DAVID

Other Attorneys

CLEMENTS, CURTIS DEAN

 

Court Documents

ANSWER FROM GARNISHEE

12/05/2022: ANSWER FROM GARNISHEE

SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED

11/16/2022: SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

11/14/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

INTERROGATORIES

10/20/2022: INTERROGATORIES

WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED

10/20/2022: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED

AFFIDAVIT FILED

09/20/2022: AFFIDAVIT FILED

CERTIFICATE

08/22/2022: CERTIFICATE

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

08/15/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

RESPONSE/REPLY

08/05/2022: RESPONSE/REPLY

INTERROGATORIES

07/28/2022: INTERROGATORIES

WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED

07/28/2022: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED

FILING - OTHER

04/18/2022: FILING - OTHER

JUDGMENT-DEFAULT

04/04/2022: JUDGMENT-DEFAULT

ORDER OTHER

11/09/2021: ORDER OTHER

ORDER RECUSAL

11/02/2021: ORDER RECUSAL

ORDER RECUSAL

11/02/2021: ORDER RECUSAL

ORDER RECUSAL

10/28/2021: ORDER RECUSAL

MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT

10/18/2021: MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER FROM GARNISHEE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT FILED; Entry: SCHEDULE AND VERIFIED AFFIDAVIT OF ALL REAL AND PERSONAL PROPERTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: CERTIFICATE; Entry: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: EFILING ADD PARTIES; Name: CLEMENTS, CURTIS DEAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: RESPONSE/REPLY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER RECUSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER RECUSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER RECUSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Entry: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less