This case was last updated from Jefferson County Courts on 04/30/2022 at 13:19:18 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC V MIKKO DOCKETT -NON-TRIAL

Case Summary

On 07/15/2021 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MIKKO DOCKETT -NON-TRIAL. This case was filed in Jefferson County Courts, Jefferson County Circuit Court located in Yell, Arkansas. The Judge overseeing this case is WYATT, ROBERT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-412

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Jefferson, Arkansas

Judge Details

Judge

WYATT, ROBERT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

DOCKETT, MIKKO

Pine Bluff, AR 71603

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TIPPETT, DONALD CLAYTON

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

07/15/2021: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $

SUMMONS ISSUED

07/15/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS SERVED

09/20/2021: SUMMONS SERVED

MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT

11/10/2021: MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT-DEFAULT

11/10/2021: JUDGMENT-DEFAULT

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER; Entry: TRIAL TYPE: N

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: JUDGMENT-DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC DISPOSITION SHEET; Name: TIPPETT, DONALD CLAYTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT; Name: TIPPETT, DONALD CLAYTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS SERVED; Name: TIPPETT, DONALD CLAYTON; Entry: SERVED ON 9/1/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAYMENT RECEIVED; Entry: A Payment of $167.50 was made on receipt 35CI4009.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOF ORIGINAL; Name: TIPPETT, DONALD CLAYTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS FEE 21-6-402 $; Name: TIPPETT, DONALD CLAYTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED; Name: TIPPETT, DONALD CLAYTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED $; Name: TIPPETT, DONALD CLAYTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL; Name: TIPPETT, DONALD CLAYTON

    Read MoreRead Less